This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/28/2023 at 07:42:52 (UTC).

BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al v. ANOBRI PHARMACEUTICALS US, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2023 BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against ANOBRI PHARMACEUTICALS US, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Claire C. Cecchi and Michael A. Hammer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-03531

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

Referral Judge

Michael A. Hammer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH

Defendants

ANOBRI PHARMACEUTICALS US, LLC

NANCHANG ANOVENT PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.

SHANGHAI ANOVENT PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SARAH ANN SULLIVAN

WILLIAM C. BATON

CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ANOBRI PHARMACEUTICALS US, LLC, NANCHANG ANOVENT PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., SHANGHAI ANOVENT PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14425557) , Related Case Selected, filed by BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (BATON, WILLIAM) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (SULLIVAN, SARAH) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH. ANOBRI PHARMACEUTICALS US, LLC waiver sent on 6/30/2023, answer due 8/29/2023. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

#6

(#6) AO120 Patent Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits) (sm) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

6 #1

Complaint and Exhibits

#7

(#7) SUMMONS ISSUED as to NANCHANG ANOVENT PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., SHANGHAI ANOVENT PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

 

Docket Entries

07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SUMMONS ISSUED as to NANCHANG ANOVENT PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., SHANGHAI ANOVENT PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) AO120 Patent Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits) (sm) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH. ANOBRI PHARMACEUTICALS US, LLC waiver sent on 6/30/2023, answer due 8/29/2023. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (SULLIVAN, SARAH) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (BATON, WILLIAM) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, ) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ANOBRI PHARMACEUTICALS US, LLC, NANCHANG ANOVENT PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., SHANGHAI ANOVENT PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14425557) , Related Case Selected, filed by BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less