This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/19/2023 at 13:50:35 (UTC).

O'Brien v. Prudential Insurance Company of America, The

Case Summary

On 09/20/2023 O'Brien filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan Richard Nelson and Elizabeth Cowan Wright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:23-CV-02905

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan Richard Nelson

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Cowan Wright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel O'Brien

Defendant

Prudential Insurance Company of America, The

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brenna Karrer

Zachary Schmoll

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10547402) filed by Daniel O'Brien. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Karrer, Brenna) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. (ACH) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Daniel O'Brien. Prudential Insurance Company of America, The waiver sent on 10/3/2023, answer due 12/4/2023. (Karrer, Brenna) (Entered: 10/11/2023)

 

Docket Entries

10/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Daniel O'Brien. Prudential Insurance Company of America, The waiver sent on 10/3/2023, answer due 12/4/2023. (Karrer, Brenna) (Entered: 10/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. (ACH) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

Docket(#2) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 23-cv-2905 SRN/ECW.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10547402) filed by Daniel O'Brien. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Karrer, Brenna) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less