This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/20/2023 at 12:29:26 (UTC).

Loretta Williams v. FCA US, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2023 Loretta Williams filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against FCA US, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Fred W. Slaughter and Autumn D. Spaeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:23-CV-00777

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fred W. Slaughter

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Loretta Williams

Defendants

FCA US, LLC

Huntington Beach Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram

Does 1 through 10 inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark William Gibson

Tionna Grace Dolin

Elizabeth A LaRocque

Defendant Attorneys

Eric Tsai

Spencer Peter Hugret

Timothy Alexander Hanna

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiff Loretta Williams. Adding Elizabeth A. LaRocque as counsel of record for Loretta Williams for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Loretta Williams. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Loretta Williams(pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/08/2023)

#15

(#15) ORDER ON PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES (CIVIL CASES) by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

#14

(#14) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court, having reviewed the pleadings and the parties' submissions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f), VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for July 6, 2023, and sets the following schedule: Jury Trial: 11/12/2024, Tuesday at 8:30 a.m.; Parties' Estimated Trial Length: 3-7 days; Final Pretrial Conference and Hearings on Motions in Limine: 10/24/2024 [Thursday at 8:30 a.m., at least 12 days before trial] (see document for further information) (bm) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

13 #1

Worksheet

#13

(#13) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan and Pretrial Worksheet ; estimated length of trial 7, filed by Plaintiff Loretta Williams.. (Attachments: #1 Worksheet)(Dolin, Tionna) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

#12

(#12) ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Scheduling Conference is set for July 6, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. See Order for details. (ev) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

#11

(#11) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (ev) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick to Judge Fred W. Slaughter for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:23-cv-00777 FWS(ADSx). (rn) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

9 #1

Certificate of Service

#9

(#9) DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tsai, Eric) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

8 #1

CV-11C

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (sh) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

1 #11

Exhibit K to Atty Decl

1 #10

Exhibit J to Atty Decl

1 #8

Exhibit H to Atty Decl

1 #2

Exhibit A to Atty Decl

1 #1

Declaration Of Attorney ISO Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30202301315220CUBCCJC Receipt No: ACACDC-35252024 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Attorney ISO Removal, #2 Exhibit A to Atty Decl, #3 Exhibit B to Atty Decl, #4 Exhibit C to Atty Decl, #5 Exhibit D to Atty Decl, #6 Exhibit F to Atty Decl, #7 Exhibit G to Atty Decl, #8 Exhibit H to Atty Decl, #9 Exhibit I to Atty Decl, #10 Exhibit J to Atty Decl, #11 Exhibit K to Atty Decl, #12 Exhibit L to Atty Decl, #13 Exhibit M to Atty Decl, #14 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Eric Tsai added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft))(Tsai, Eric) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiff Loretta Williams. Adding Elizabeth A. LaRocque as counsel of record for Loretta Williams for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Loretta Williams. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Loretta Williams(pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) ORDER ON PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES (CIVIL CASES) by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court, having reviewed the pleadings and the parties' submissions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f), VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for July 6, 2023, and sets the following schedule: Jury Trial: 11/12/2024, Tuesday at 8:30 a.m.; Parties' Estimated Trial Length: 3-7 days; Final Pretrial Conference and Hearings on Motions in Limine: 10/24/2024 [Thursday at 8:30 a.m., at least 12 days before trial] (see document for further information) (bm) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan and Pretrial Worksheet ; estimated length of trial 7, filed by Plaintiff Loretta Williams.. (Attachments: #1 Worksheet)(Dolin, Tionna) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Scheduling Conference is set for July 6, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. See Order for details. (ev) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (ev) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick to Judge Fred W. Slaughter for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:23-cv-00777 FWS(ADSx). (rn) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tsai, Eric) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (sh) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. [STATE COURT FILE DATE NOT INDICATED SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 7 EXHIBIT G TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCONFORMED EFILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, FCA US, LLC, Huntington Beach Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram.Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Loretta Williams. [FILED IN STATE COURT 03/23/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC, Atty Decl in Support of Removal served on 05/04/2023. (Tsai, Eric) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Timothy Alexander Hanna on behalf of Defendant FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Timothy Alexander Hanna added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft))(Hanna, Timothy) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eric Tsai on behalf of Defendant FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tsai, Eric) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC, identifying FCA US, LLC; FCA North America Holdings LLC; Stellantis Ventures B.V. (formerly known as FCA Holdco B.V.); Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tsai, Eric) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tsai, Eric) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30202301315220CUBCCJC Receipt No: ACACDC-35252024 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Attorney ISO Removal, #2 Exhibit A to Atty Decl, #3 Exhibit B to Atty Decl, #4 Exhibit C to Atty Decl, #5 Exhibit D to Atty Decl, #6 Exhibit F to Atty Decl, #7 Exhibit G to Atty Decl, #8 Exhibit H to Atty Decl, #9 Exhibit I to Atty Decl, #10 Exhibit J to Atty Decl, #11 Exhibit K to Atty Decl, #12 Exhibit L to Atty Decl, #13 Exhibit M to Atty Decl, #14 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Eric Tsai added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft))(Tsai, Eric) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less