This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/15/2023 at 07:54:58 (UTC).

Button v. Tew et al

Case Summary

On 06/16/2023 Button filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Tew. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lawrence J. Vilardo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00554

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lawrence J. Vilardo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Justin Button

Defendants

Todd Eric Tew

Smith Transport, Inc.

Walmart Transportation, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard A. Hall

Defendant Attorney

Meghan M. Brown

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Smith Transport, Inc., Todd Eric Tew from Supreme Court Erie County, case number 805943/2023. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4902654), filed by Smith Transport, Inc., Todd Eric Tew. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Meghan) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Walmart Transportation, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (NOTICE OF JOINDER IN REMOVAL) (Schechter, Joel) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

#3

(#3) Letter filed by Smith Transport, Inc., Todd Eric Tew as to Walmart Transportation, LLC, Smith Transport, Inc., Todd Eric Tew Advising Matter Settled. (Brown, Meghan) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by Justin Button Notice of Dismissal (Hall, Richard) (Entered: 07/27/2023)

 

Docket Entries

07/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER: The notice of dismissal with prejudice filed by the plaintiff, Docket Item #5 , is ordered. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 7/28/2023. (DJ)Clerk to Follow up (Entered: 07/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE by Justin Button Notice of Dismissal (Hall, Richard) (Entered: 07/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER: The Notice of Settlement filed on 6/26/2023 indicates that this matter has settled. Pursuant to Local Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a), the parties have 14 days after the case has settled to submit a stipulation of dismissal or other appropriate document (e.g., consent decree). Local Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) further provides that if such document is not timely filed, the Court may enter an order dismissing the case as settled, without costs and on the merits. The parties are hereby ordered to submit either a stipulation of dismissal or a status update, or to move for an extension of time to do so, on or before 8/25/2023. Otherwise, the Court will enter an order dismissing the case pursuant to Local Rule 41(a). SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 6/27/2023. (DJ) (Entered: 06/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Letter filed by Smith Transport, Inc., Todd Eric Tew as to Walmart Transportation, LLC, Smith Transport, Inc., Todd Eric Tew Advising Matter Settled. (Brown, Meghan) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE by Walmart Transportation, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (NOTICE OF JOINDER IN REMOVAL) (Schechter, Joel) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DocketCase Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Smith Transport, Inc., Todd Eric Tew from Supreme Court Erie County, case number 805943/2023. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4902654), filed by Smith Transport, Inc., Todd Eric Tew. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Meghan) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less