This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/08/2023 at 08:32:41 (UTC).

Zaiullah v. Smith Transport, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/09/2023 Zaiullah filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Smith Transport, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Ann M Donnelly and Lois Bloom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-01823

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ann M Donnelly

Referral Judge

Lois Bloom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NFN ZAIULLAH

Defendant

Smith Transport, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark J. Linder

Michelle Jean-Jacques

Defendant Attorney

Matthew P. Levy

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Smith Transport, Inc. from Supreme Kings, case number 501755/2023. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-16483526) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Email, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Levy, Matthew) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit A -Summons & Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B- Email

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement

#2

(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Smith Transport, Inc. (Levy, Matthew) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

#3

(#3) VERIFIED ANSWER to Complaint by Smith Transport, Inc.. (Levy, Matthew) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Jean-Jacques on behalf of Nfn Zaiullah (aty to be noticed) (Jean-Jacques, Michelle) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

#5

(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (SR) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

#6

(#6) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SR) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

#7

(#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Levy, Matthew) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Nfn Zaiullah AS TO PROPERTY DAMAGE CLAIM IN THE COMPLAINT. (Jean-Jacques, Michelle) (Entered: 04/12/2023)

 

Docket Entries

04/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Nfn Zaiullah AS TO PROPERTY DAMAGE CLAIM IN THE COMPLAINT. (Jean-Jacques, Michelle) (Entered: 04/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketORDER: The Court held the initial conference in this removal diversity action on April 11, 2023 and set the following deadlines. Plaintiff shall produce any outstanding authorizations or releases by April 18, 2023. The parties shall file any protective order by June 9, 2023. Any motion to amend the pleadings or join new parties shall be filed by May 18, 2023. Fed R. Civ. P. 16(b)(3)(A). The parties shall complete all fact discovery by October 11, 2023. Any expert discovery that is needed shall be completed by December 11, 2023. Any pre-motion conference request shall be filed by December 18, 2023 in accordance with Judge Donnelly's Individual Rules. By June 12, 2023, the parties shall file a joint status letter regarding their efforts to identify the passengers in plaintiff's vehicle at the time of the accident, their progress in discovery, and the parties' interest in a settlement conference or referral to Court-annexed mediation. The Court strongly encourages the parties to consider early settlement of this matter. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 4/11/2023. (EW) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom: Initial Conference Hearing held on 4/11/2023 (FTR Log #11:55-12:20.) (EW) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Levy, Matthew) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER: Defendant's counsel removed this diversity motor vehicle case from Kings County Supreme Court on March 9, 2023. ECF No. #1 . The Court shall hold the initial conference on April 11, 2023 at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. The parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and file their Rule 26(f) Meeting Report with the Court by April 4, 2023. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least seventy-two (72) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 3/16/2023. (VP) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SR) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (SR) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Jean-Jacques on behalf of Nfn Zaiullah (aty to be noticed) (Jean-Jacques, Michelle) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023

DocketThis case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (SR) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SR) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) VERIFIED ANSWER to Complaint by Smith Transport, Inc.. (Levy, Matthew) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Smith Transport, Inc. (Levy, Matthew) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Smith Transport, Inc. from Supreme Kings, case number 501755/2023. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-16483526) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Email, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Levy, Matthew) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less