This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/07/2023 at 02:35:41 (UTC).

Lei Zhu et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2023 Lei Zhu filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Consuelo B. Marshall and Karen L. Stevenson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-06400

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Consuelo B. Marshall

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEI ZHU

WENCHAO HUANG

YANJIE HUANG

Defendants

UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES

DIRECTOR OF THE UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES LOS ANGELES ASYLUM OFFICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Arthur Minas

Defendant Attorneys

Ernesto Molina

Nancy K Canter

OIL-DCS Trial Attorney

Oil Appellate

 

Court Documents

#1

No Description Available

#2

No Description Available

#3

No Description Available

#4

No Description Available

#5

No Description Available

#6

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (See Order for details). (ys) (Entered: 08/11/2023)

#12

RESTRICTED

#14

(#14) ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY CASE PENDING ADJUDICATION OF APPLICATION, #13 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the instant action shall be stayed until Tuesday, January 21, 2025. (shb) (Entered: 10/04/2023)

 

Docket Entries

09/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY CASE PENDING ADJUDICATION OF APPLICATION, #13 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the instant action shall be stayed until Tuesday, January 21, 2025. (shb) (Entered: 10/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending adjudication of asylum application filed by Defendants Director of The United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Los Angeles Asylum Office, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Nancy K Canter added to party Director of The United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Los Angeles Asylum Office(pty:dft), Attorney Nancy K Canter added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft))(Canter, Nancy) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Oil Appellate on behalf of Defendants Director of The United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Los Angeles Asylum Office, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Attorney Oil Appellate added to party Director of The United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Los Angeles Asylum Office(pty:dft), Attorney Oil Appellate added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft))(Appellate, Oil) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (See Order for details). (ys) (Entered: 08/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendants Director of The United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Los Angeles Asylum Office, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Defendant Director of The United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Los Angeles Asylum Office, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (lh) (Entered: 08/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 08/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh) (Entered: 08/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less