This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/18/2023 at 08:21:33 (UTC).

WILLIAMS v. UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 WILLIAMS filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and JOE L. WEBSTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00415

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. SCHROEDER

Referral Judge

JOE L. WEBSTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Not Yet Classified

MATTHEW DRAKE WILLIAMS

UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY

Defendants and Not Yet Classified

UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

PORTIER, LLC

UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

WILLIAM E. WEST, JR.

ALLEN C. SMITH

Not Yet Classified and Defendant Attorneys

ALLEN C. SMITH

JAMES M. DEDMAN, IV

EMILY SEATON

LINDSAY A. JOYNER

 

Court Documents

15 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#15

(#15) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #12 Amended Complaint, by PORTIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SEATON, EMILY) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney LINDSAY A. JOYNER on behalf of Defendants PORTIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3591459.) (JOYNER, LINDSAY) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

13 #2

Exhibit Policy language

13 #1

Exhibit Declaration Page

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Counterclaim by UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration Page, #2 Exhibit Policy language)(SMITH, ALLEN) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

#12

(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant PORTIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY, filed by MATTHEW DRAKE WILLIAMS. (State Court document originally filed in Davidson County Superior Court, case number: 23CVS690) (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

11 #1

Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Amended State Court Complaint

#11

(#11) Consent MOTION File Amended State Court Complaint and Extend Time to Answer by PORTIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. Response to Motion due by 7/5/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Amended State Court Complaint)(DEDMAN, JAMES) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to PORTIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (State Court document originally filed in Davidson County Superior Court, case number 23cvs690, issued on 4/03/2023, listed as exhibit as Exhibit A to the #1 Petition for Removal) (Bowers, Alexis) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint, (Amended Motion) by PORTIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DEDMAN, JAMES) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JAMES M. DEDMAN, IV on behalf of Defendants Portier, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (DEDMAN, JAMES) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

1 #4

Certificate of Service

1 #3

Proposed Acknowledgment of State Court

1 #2

Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

#1

(#4) Summons Issued as to PORTIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (State Court document originally filed in Davidson County Superior Court, case number 23cvs690, issued on 4/03/2023, listed as exhibit as Exhibit A to the #1 Petition for Removal) (Bowers, Alexis) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint for PORTIER, LLC and UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. Answer due by 7/24/2023. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 7/17/2023. (Brubaker, John) (Entered: 07/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #12 Amended Complaint, by PORTIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SEATON, EMILY) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney LINDSAY A. JOYNER on behalf of Defendants PORTIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3591459.) (JOYNER, LINDSAY) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Counterclaim by UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration Page, #2 Exhibit Policy language)(SMITH, ALLEN) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketReset Deadlines: PORTIER, LLC answer due 7/14/2023; UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. answer due 7/14/2023. (See 6/14/2023 Text Order) (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant PORTIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY, filed by MATTHEW DRAKE WILLIAMS. (State Court document originally filed in Davidson County Superior Court, case number: 23CVS690) (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting #11 Consent Motion Regarding Filing of Amended Complaint. For good cause shown, the motion is granted, and the Clerk is directed to file and docket Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, attached as Exhibit A to the motion (Docket Entry 11-1). The Amended Complaint shall be treated as the operative complaint in this matter. The deadline for Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc. and Portier, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint shall be extended up to and including July 14, 2023. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 6/14/2023.(Lee, Pedra) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Referred to MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER RE: #11 Consent MOTION File Amended State Court Complaint and Extend Time to Answer. (Engle, Anita) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Consent MOTION File Amended State Court Complaint and Extend Time to Answer by PORTIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. Response to Motion due by 7/5/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Amended State Court Complaint)(DEDMAN, JAMES) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for United Financial Casualty Company. Answer due by 7/9/2023. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 6/7/2023. (Brubaker, John) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by PORTIER, LLC; UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. Answer due 6/15/2023. Signed by Gloria L. Powell on 5/23/2023 on behlaf of John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Powell, Gloria) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint, (Amended Motion) by PORTIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DEDMAN, JAMES) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Bowers, Alexis) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Bowers, Alexis) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint, by PORTIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (DEDMAN, JAMES) (Entered: 05/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketCase Assigned to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Powell, Gloria) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to PORTIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (State Court document originally filed in Davidson County Superior Court, case number 23cvs690, issued on 4/03/2023, listed as exhibit as Exhibit A to the #1 Petition for Removal) (Bowers, Alexis) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against PORTIER, LLC, PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., filed by MATTHEW DRAKE WILLIAMS. (State Court document originally filed in Davidson County Superior Court, case number 23cvs690, listed as exhibit as Exhibit A to the #1 Petition for Removal) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Bowers, Alexis) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JAMES M. DEDMAN, IV on behalf of Defendants Portier, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (DEDMAN, JAMES) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Davidson County Superior Court, case number 23cv690 against Matthew Drake Williams ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3566457.), filed by Portier, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Proposed Acknowledgment of State Court, #4 Certificate of Service)(DEDMAN, JAMES) Modified on 5/19/2023 to add State Court information. (Bowers, Alexis). (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less