This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/18/2023 at 07:02:48 (UTC).

Colbert et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 Colbert was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Gonzalo P. Curiel and Daniel E. Butcher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00924

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gonzalo P. Curiel

Referral Judge

Daniel E. Butcher

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Janae Colbert

Tammy Marie Colbert

Kaiden R. Flanagan

Karter A. Flanagan

Defendants

IC Marks, Inc.

QVC, Inc.

Qurate Retail, Inc.

Does 1 through 50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua C. Braddock

Defendant Attorney

David Allen Shimkin

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-17863555.), filed by IC Marks, Inc., Qurate Retail, Inc., QVC, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration Declaration of David A. Shimkin, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Declaration of Vincent LaMonaca)The new case number is 3:23-cv-924-GPC-DEB. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case.(ggv) (sjt). (Entered: 05/19/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Declaration Declaration of David A. Shimkin

1 #3

Exhibit A

1 #4

Exhibit B

1 #5

Exhibit C

1 #6

Exhibit D

1 #7

Declaration of Vincent LaMonaca

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by IC Marks, Inc., QVC, Inc., Qurate Retail, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Qurate Retail, Inc. for QVC, Inc... (Shimkin, David) (jmo). (Entered: 05/31/2023)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by IC Marks, Inc., QVC, Inc., Qurate Retail, Inc.(Shimkin, David) (jmo). (Entered: 07/10/2023)

#4

(#4) Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2023 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Joint Discovery Plan due 9/15/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 7/10/23.(jmo) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

 

Docket Entries

07/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2023 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Joint Discovery Plan due 9/15/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 7/10/23.(jmo) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by IC Marks, Inc., QVC, Inc., Qurate Retail, Inc.(Shimkin, David) (jmo). (Entered: 07/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by IC Marks, Inc., QVC, Inc., Qurate Retail, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Qurate Retail, Inc. for QVC, Inc... (Shimkin, David) (jmo). (Entered: 05/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-17863555.), filed by IC Marks, Inc., Qurate Retail, Inc., QVC, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration Declaration of David A. Shimkin, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Declaration of Vincent LaMonaca)The new case number is 3:23-cv-924-GPC-DEB. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case.(ggv) (sjt). (Entered: 05/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less