This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/23/2023 at 08:59:08 (UTC).

Hoang Tran v. Houston Police Department

Case Summary

On 07/25/2023 Hoang Tran filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Houston Police Department. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alfred H Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-02817

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alfred H Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thien Tony Hoang Tran

Defendant

Houston Police Department

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Houston Police Department filed by Thien Tony Hoang Tran. Application to Proceed IFP Granted by Judge Tipton on 07/25/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ShannonHolden, 4) (Entered: 08/01/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Houston Police Department. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShannonHolden, 4) (Entered: 08/01/2023)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/1/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ShannonHolden, 4) (Entered: 08/01/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (ShannonHolden, 4) (Entered: 08/01/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. This entry is a duplicate of #4 and was re-docketed to include information on page 1 regarding responsibility to prepare summons. (LisaTien, 4) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

 

Docket Entries

09/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. This entry is a duplicate of #4 and was re-docketed to include information on page 1 regarding responsibility to prepare summons. (LisaTien, 4) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (ShannonHolden, 4) (Entered: 08/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/1/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ShannonHolden, 4) (Entered: 08/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Houston Police Department. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShannonHolden, 4) (Entered: 08/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Houston Police Department filed by Thien Tony Hoang Tran. Application to Proceed IFP Granted by Judge Tipton on 07/25/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ShannonHolden, 4) (Entered: 08/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less