This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/16/2023 at 13:54:06 (UTC).

Hartman v. Polaris Industries, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/18/2023 Hartman filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against Polaris Industries, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Greg N. Stivers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00095

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Greg N. Stivers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roy Hartman

Defendants

Polaris Industries, Inc.

Jared Carter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Masten Childers, III

Michael W. Durborow

Aaron Oppegard

Justin S. Peterson

Kellie M. Collins

Laura Jane Phelps

Defendant Attorney

John P. Rodgers

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Polaris Industries, Inc. from Warren Circuit Court, case number 23-CI-00941 (filing fee $402, receipt number AKYWDC-3846501). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court File, #2 Cover Sheet) (MNM) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court File

1 #2

Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (MNM) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal. Reason for Deficiency: Rule 7.1(a)(1) Corporate Disclosure Statement and Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/25/2023. (MNM) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

#4

(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Warren Circuit Court (MNM) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) by Polaris Industries, Inc. Corporate Parent - Polaris, Inc. (Rodgers, John) Modified corporate parent and docket text on 7/20/2023 (DeW). (Entered: 07/19/2023)

#6

(#6) Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Polaris Industries, Inc.. (Rodgers, John) (Entered: 08/03/2023)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Remand and for Fees by Plaintiff Roy Hartman (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support of Remand, #2 Exhibit photo, #3 Exhibit email) (Childers, Masten) (Entered: 08/04/2023)

7 #1

Memorandum in Support Memo in Support of Remand

7 #2

Exhibit photo

7 #3

Exhibit email

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Aaron Oppegard re #1 Notice of Removal.Reason for Deficiency: Full Admission to WDKY/motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 8/31/2023. (KJA) (Entered: 08/14/2023)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Polaris Industries, Inc.. (Rodgers, John) (Entered: 08/22/2023)

#10

(#10) RESPONSE to Motion re MOTION for Attorney Fees, #7 MOTION to Remand and for Fees filed by Polaris Industries, Inc.. (Rodgers, John) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

#11

(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand and for Fees Plaintiff's Reply to Polaris' Response to filed by Roy Hartman. (Childers, Masten) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand and for Fees Plaintiff's Reply to Polaris' Response to filed by Roy Hartman. (Childers, Masten) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) RESPONSE to Motion re MOTION for Attorney Fees, #7 MOTION to Remand and for Fees filed by Polaris Industries, Inc.. (Rodgers, John) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Polaris Industries, Inc.. (Rodgers, John) (Entered: 08/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Aaron Oppegard re #1 Notice of Removal.Reason for Deficiency: Full Admission to WDKY/motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 8/31/2023. (KJA) (Entered: 08/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff Roy Hartman (No document attached-for reporting purposes only. See DN #7 to view PDF) (JWM) (Entered: 08/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) MOTION to Remand and for Fees by Plaintiff Roy Hartman (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support of Remand, #2 Exhibit photo, #3 Exhibit email) (Childers, Masten) (Entered: 08/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Polaris Industries, Inc.. (Rodgers, John) (Entered: 08/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) by Polaris Industries, Inc. Corporate Parent - Polaris, Inc. (Rodgers, John) Modified corporate parent and docket text on 7/20/2023 (DeW). (Entered: 07/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Warren Circuit Court (MNM) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal. Reason for Deficiency: Rule 7.1(a)(1) Corporate Disclosure Statement and Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/25/2023. (MNM) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (MNM) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Polaris Industries, Inc. from Warren Circuit Court, case number 23-CI-00941 (filing fee $402, receipt number AKYWDC-3846501). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court File, #2 Cover Sheet) (MNM) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less