This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/19/2023 at 07:03:57 (UTC).

Santiago v. Walgreen Co. et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2023 Santiago filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Walgreen Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Elaine E. Bucklo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-13951

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elaine E. Bucklo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrea Santiago

Defendants

Walgreen Co.

Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation

Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation

GlaxoSmithKline, LLC

GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas), Inc.

Pfizer, Inc.

John Does 1-100 Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Anthony Bruegger

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Patrick Eby

Julia Ruth Zousmer

Rami N Fakhouri

George D Sax

Stephanie Ann Scharf

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendants' motion for extension of time #20 is granted. Defendants' response to plaintiff's motion to remand due 10 days after the JPML vacates its conditional transfer order. Ruling set for 11/15/2023 is stricken. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 11/13/2023)

25 #6

Exhibit F - 9.20.23 Brand Defendants Motion for Partial Dismissal of 1st Amended

25 #3

Exhibit C - 7.19.23 Order Continuing CMC

25 #2

Exhibit B - 5.18.23 CMO

#20

(#20) MOTION by Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas), Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Pfizer, Inc. for extension of time (Opposed Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Eby, Christopher) (Entered: 10/31/2023)

16 #5

Exhibit

16 #4

Exhibit

16 #3

Exhibit

16 #1

Exhibit

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2023-L-007883) filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21118522. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Zousmer, Julia) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#26) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendants' motion for extension of time #20 is granted. Defendants' response to plaintiff's motion to remand due 10 days after the JPML vacates its conditional transfer order. Ruling set for 11/15/2023 is stricken. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 11/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) RESPONSE by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas), Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Pfizer, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Andrea Santiago to remand and Memorandum of Law #16 REMOVING DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CTO-119, #2 Exhibit B - 5.18.23 CMO, #3 Exhibit C - 7.19.23 Order Continuing CMC, #4 Exhibit D - 4.13.23 Retailer Defendants MTD, #5 Exhibit E - 4.13.23 Brand Defendants MTD, #6 Exhibit F - 9.20.23 Brand Defendants Motion for Partial Dismissal of 1st Amended Master Complaint)(Zousmer, Julia) (Entered: 11/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas), Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC (Fakhouri, Rami) (Entered: 11/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas), Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC by Rami N Fakhouri (Fakhouri, Rami) (Entered: 11/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Per minute entry #18 dated 10/24/2023, a briefing schedule has been set on plaintiff's opposed motion and memorandum of law to remand pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447. Motion hearing set for 11/3/2023 is stricken, no appearance required. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 11/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) NOTICE of Motion by Christopher Patrick Eby for presentment of extension of time, #20 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 11/3/2023 at 09:45 AM. (Eby, Christopher) (Entered: 10/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) MOTION by Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas), Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Pfizer, Inc. for extension of time (Opposed Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Eby, Christopher) (Entered: 10/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Andrea Santiago by John Anthony Bruegger (Bruegger, John) (Entered: 10/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Parties to take note of Judge Bucklo's motion call practice posted on her page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Defendants' response to plaintiff's opposed motion and memorandum of law to remand pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447 #16 is due by 11/7/2023. Ruling set for 11/15/2023. The Court will issue a ruling by mail. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 10/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Pfizer, Inc. by Stephanie Ann Scharf (Scharf, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Motion by Julia Ruth Zousmer for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #8 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/4/2023 at 09:45 AM. (Zousmer, Julia) (Entered: 09/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) MOTION by Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas), Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Pfizer, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Zousmer, Julia) (Entered: 09/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo for all further proceedings. Honorable Andrea R. Wood no longer assigned to the case pursuant to IOP 13(f)(1). Signed by Executive Committee on 09/22/2023. (daj, ) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Andrea Santiago by John Anthony Bruegger (Special and Limited Entry of Appearance) (Bruegger, John) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation (Zousmer, Julia) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jxm, ) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation by Christopher Patrick Eby (Eby, Christopher) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation by Julia Ruth Zousmer (Zousmer, Julia) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Zousmer, Julia) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2023-L-007883) filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21118522. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Zousmer, Julia) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less