This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2023 at 14:04:57 (UTC).

Bond v. TransUnion LLC

Case Summary

On 09/14/2023 Bond filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against TransUnion LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Martin C Carlson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-01534

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin C Carlson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jasmine Bond

Defendant

TransUnion LLC

 

Court Documents

#1

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against TRANSUNION LLC, filed by JASMINE BOND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 COVER LETTER)(bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2023.] (Entered: 07/06/2023)

2 #1

Exhibit

2 #2

COVER LETTER

#3

(#3) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2023.] (Entered: 07/06/2023)

#4

(#4) ORDER THAT NO LATER THAN AUGUST 8, 2023, MS. BOND SHALL SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THESE CASES SHOULD NOT BE TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. MS. BOND SHOULD TITLE ANY RESPONSE TO THIS ORDER RESPONSE TO SHOW CAUSE ORDER. IF MS. BOND FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, HER CASES MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 7/25/23. 7/25/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2023.] (Entered: 07/25/2023)

#5

(#5) ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASES TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. FUTURE FILINGS IN THESE MATTERS SHOULD BE DIRECTED TO THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. MS. BONDS PENDING MOTIONS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, (EQUIFAX, DI 1, EXPERIAN, DI 1, TRANSUNION, DI 1), SHALL BE LEFT TO THE DISCRETION OF THE TRANSFEREE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 9/8/23. (BW) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2023.] (Entered: 09/08/2023)

#6

(#6) Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:23-cv-02564 containing electronic documents. jw (Entered: 09/14/2023)

6 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that these two actions ARE CONSOLIDATEDfor all further proceedings, at Civil Number 4:23-CV-1220, and Civil Number 4:23-CV-1534 is administratively closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on September 15, 2023. (kjn) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

 

Docket Entries

09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that these two actions ARE CONSOLIDATEDfor all further proceedings, at Civil Number 4:23-CV-1220, and Civil Number 4:23-CV-1534 is administratively closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on September 15, 2023. (kjn) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:23-cv-02564 containing electronic documents. jw (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASES TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. FUTURE FILINGS IN THESE MATTERS SHOULD BE DIRECTED TO THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. MS. BONDS PENDING MOTIONS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, (EQUIFAX, DI 1, EXPERIAN, DI 1, TRANSUNION, DI 1), SHALL BE LEFT TO THE DISCRETION OF THE TRANSFEREE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 9/8/23. (BW) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2023.] (Entered: 09/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ORDER THAT NO LATER THAN AUGUST 8, 2023, MS. BOND SHALL SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THESE CASES SHOULD NOT BE TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. MS. BOND SHOULD TITLE ANY RESPONSE TO THIS ORDER RESPONSE TO SHOW CAUSE ORDER. IF MS. BOND FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, HER CASES MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 7/25/23. 7/25/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2023.] (Entered: 07/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2023.] (Entered: 07/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against TRANSUNION LLC, filed by JASMINE BOND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 COVER LETTER)(bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2023.] (Entered: 07/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by JASMINE BOND..(bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2023.] (Entered: 07/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less