This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/24/2023 at 08:45:10 (UTC).

Frank Surrell v. Albertsons LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 Frank Surrell filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Albertsons LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:23-CV-00948

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frank Surrell

Defendants

Albertsons LLC

Does 1 through 20, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ruben Limonjyan

Zaruhi Arakelyan

Defendant Attorney

Leigh A White

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange, case number 30-2023-01318737 Receipt No: ACACDC-35377747 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Albertsons LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet and Notice of CMC, #3 Exhibit C - Answer to Complaint) (Attorney Leigh A White added to party Albertsons LLC(pty:bkmov))(White, Leigh) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet and Notice of CMC

1 #3

Exhibit C - Answer to Complaint

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Albertsons LLC. (White, Leigh) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Albertsons LLC, identifying Albertson's LLC; Albertsons Companies, Inc.. (White, Leigh) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#4

(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Albertsons LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on May 25, 2023. (White, Leigh) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Fred W. Slaughter for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Karen E. Scott. New Case Number 8:23-cv-00937 FWS (KESx). (sh) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Fred W. Slaughter for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Karen E. Scott. New Case Number 8:23-cv-00937 FWS (KESx). (sh) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Albertsons LLC. [STATE COURT FILE DATE NOT INDICATED SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT C TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED EFILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT against Defendants Albertsons LLC, Does. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Frank Surrell. [FILED IN STATE COURT 04/11/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Albertsons LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on May 25, 2023. (White, Leigh) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Albertsons LLC, identifying Albertson's LLC; Albertsons Companies, Inc.. (White, Leigh) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Albertsons LLC. (White, Leigh) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange, case number 30-2023-01318737 Receipt No: ACACDC-35377747 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Albertsons LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet and Notice of CMC, #3 Exhibit C - Answer to Complaint) (Attorney Leigh A White added to party Albertsons LLC(pty:bkmov))(White, Leigh) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less