This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/15/2023 at 13:53:12 (UTC).

Houser v. Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2023 Houser filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen Gren Scholer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-01592

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen Gren Scholer

 

Party Details

Defendants

Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company

American Home Assurance Company

Arrowood Indemnity Company

Aviva PLC

Brighthouse Life Insurance Company

CNA Financial Corporation

Consolidated National Insurance Company

The Continental Insurance Company

Crum & Forster Indemnity Company

Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company

Evanston Insurance Company

General Insurance Company of America

Great American Assurance Company

Great American E & S Insurance Company

Jefferson Insurance Company

London and Edinburgh Insurance Company Limited

Munich Reinsurance America, Inc.

National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford

National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA

Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America

126 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

David Michael Hymer

Richard D Salgado

Alex Michael Spisak

Ryan Smethurst

Betty X Yang

Amanda George

James Hallowell

Michael A Rosenthal

Pamela Dunlop Gates

Laura K McNally

Other Attorneys

Jeffrey M Tillotson

Thomas B Alleman

Brian S Martin

Christina Anne Culver

David J Schubert

Ronald P Schiller

Blake S Evans

Elizabeth Dolce

Matthew A Hamermesh

Stephen W Burnett

59 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

117 #2

Proposed Order

117 #1

Certificate of Good Standing for Richard A. Galbo

#117

(#117) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Richard A. Galbo (Filing fee $100; Receipt number BTXNDC-14034099) filed by National Casualty Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company, Wausau General Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Richard A. Galbo, #2 Proposed Order) (Capote, Ashlyn) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#116

(#116) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Mark Wiggins on behalf of QBE Insurance Corporation. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Wiggins, John) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#115

(#115) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jo Allison Stasney on behalf of QBE Insurance Corporation. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Stasney, Jo) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#114

(#114) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arrowood Indemnity Company. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Cooke, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

110 #2

Proposed Order

110 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#110

(#110) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Kim V. Marrkand (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14032329) filed by Liberty Insurance Underwriters Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation, Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Wausau General Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Tobin, Aaron) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

4 #2

Additional Page(s)

4 #1

Additional Page(s)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc., Allied World Assurance Company, Ltd., Allstate Insurance Company, American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, American Economy Insurance Company, American Excess Insurance Association, American Home Assurance Company, American States Insurance Company, Amerisure Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Argonaut Insurance Company, Arrowood Indemnity Company, Aspen Specialty Insurance Company, Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company, Aviva PLC, Axis Specialty Insurance Company, Axis Surplus Insurance Company, Brighthouse Life Insurance Company, CNA Financial Corporation, Catlin Specialty Insurance Company, Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, Colony Insurance Company, Columbia Casualty Company, Columbia Insurance Company, Consolidated National Insurance Company, Continental Casualty Company, Crum & Forster Indemnity Company, Doe Defendants 1-100, Endurance American Insurance Company, Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company, Erie Family Life Insurance Company, Erie Insurance Exchange, Erie and Niagara Insurance Association, Evanston Insurance Company, Everest National Insurance Company, Firemans Fund Insurance Company, First Insurance Company of Hawaii, Ltd., Gemini Insurance Company, General Insurance Company of America, General Star Indemnity Company, Great American Assurance Company, Great American E & S Insurance Company, Great American Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Interstate Fire & Casualty Company, Jefferson Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Underwriters Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation, London and Edinburgh Insurance Company Limited, Munich Reinsurance America, Inc., National Casualty Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, National Surety Corporation, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, New Hampshire Insurance Company, Normandy Reinsurance Company Limited, Old Republic Insurance Company, Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company, Phoenix Insurance Company, QBE Insurance Corporation, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Scottsdale Insurance Company, Security Mutual Insurance Company, Sparta Insurance Company, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, St. Paul Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Swiss Re Corporate Solutions Capacity Insurance Corporation, TIG Insurance Company, Tenecom Limited, The Cincinnati Insurance Company, The Continental Insurance Company, The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, The North River Insurance Company, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, The Travelers Companies, Inc., The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers (Bermuda) Limited, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company, United States Fire Insurance Company, Universal Re-Insurance Company Limited, Utica Mutual Insurance Company, Wausau General Insurance Company, Westport Insurance Corporation, XL Bermuda Limited, XL Insurance Company SE. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s)) (ndt) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Barbara J. Houser. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Tillotson, Jeffrey) (Main Document 2 replaced to flatten on 7/18/2023) (ndt). (Entered: 07/18/2023)

1 #3

Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit(s)

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Barbara J. Houser. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13889164) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet) (Tillotson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

141 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#118) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #117 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard Galbo. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/14/2023) (chmb) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#117) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Richard A. Galbo (Filing fee $100; Receipt number BTXNDC-14034099) filed by National Casualty Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company, Wausau General Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Richard A. Galbo, #2 Proposed Order) (Capote, Ashlyn) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#116) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Mark Wiggins on behalf of QBE Insurance Corporation. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Wiggins, John) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#115) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jo Allison Stasney on behalf of QBE Insurance Corporation. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Stasney, Jo) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#114) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arrowood Indemnity Company. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Cooke, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#113) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #110 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kim V. Marrkand. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/14/2023) (chmb) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#112) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #109 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Douglas R. Gooding. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/14/2023) (chmb) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#111) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #108 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bryana T. McGillycuddy. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/14/2023) (chmb) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#110) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Kim V. Marrkand (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14032329) filed by Liberty Insurance Underwriters Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation, Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Wausau General Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Tobin, Aaron) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#109) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Douglas R. Gooding (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14032270) filed by Liberty Insurance Underwriters Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation, Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Wausau General Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Tobin, Aaron) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
98 More Docket Entries
08/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to American Economy Insurance Company, served on 8/7/2023; American Home Assurance Company, served on 8/7/2023; American States Insurance Company, served on 8/7/2023; Arch Insurance Company, served on 8/7/2023; Argonaut Insurance Company, served on 8/7/2023; Arrowood Indemnity Company, served on 8/7/2023; Aspen Specialty Insurance Company, served on 8/7/2023; Axis Specialty Insurance Company, served on 8/7/2023; Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, served on 8/7/2023; Columbia Insurance Company, served on 8/7/2023; Consolidated National Insurance Company, served on 8/7/2023; Great American Assurance Company, served on 8/7/2023; Great American Insurance Company, served on 8/7/2023. (cfk) (Entered: 08/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company; served on 8/4/2023; Allstate Insurance Company; served on 8/4/2023; American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania; served on 8/4/2023; Brighthouse Life Insurance Company; served on 8/4/2023; Continental Casualty Company; served on 8/4/2023; Crum & Forster Indemnity Company ; served on 8/4/2023; Endurance American Insurance Company; served on 8/4/2023; Firemans Fund Insurance Company; served on 8/4/2023; Indian Harbor Insurance Company; served on 8/4/2023; Interstate Fire & Casualty Company; served on 8/4/2023; National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford; served on 8/4/2023; National Surety Corporation; served on 8/4/2023; QBE Insurance Corporation; served on 8/4/2023; TIG Insurance Company; served on 8/4/2023; The Cincinnati Insurance Company ; served on 8/4/2023; The Continental Insurance Company; served on 8/4/2023; The North River Insurance Company; served on 8/4/2023; United States Fire Insurance Company; served on 8/4/2023; Utica Mutual Insurance Company; served on 8/4/2023; Westport Insurance Corporation; served on 8/4/2023. (Attachments: #1 Continental Casualty Company, #2 Endurance American Insurance Company, #3 Firemans Fund Insurance Company, #4 Indian Harbor Insurance Company, #5 Interstate Fire & Casualty Company, #6 National Surety Corporation, #7 The Cincinnati Insurance Company, #8 Utica Mutual Insurance Company, #9 Allstate Insurance Company, #10 QBE Insurance Corporation, #11 TIG Insurance Company, #12 The Continental Insurance Company, #13 The North River Insurance Company, #14 United States Fire Insurance Company, #15 Westport Insurance Corporation, #16 Brighthouse Life Insurance Company, #17 Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, #18 Crum & Forster Indemnity Company, #19 National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford) (agc) (Entered: 08/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Erie and Niagara Insurance Association; served on 8/7/2023. (agc) (Entered: 08/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation; served on 8/4/2023; Wausau General Insurance Company; served on 8/4/2023. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (agc) (Entered: 08/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company; served on 8/4/2023. (cfk) (Entered: 08/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Gemini Insurance Company; served on 8/7/2023. (cfk) (Entered: 08/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc., Allied World Assurance Company, Ltd., Allstate Insurance Company, American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, American Economy Insurance Company, American Excess Insurance Association, American Home Assurance Company, American States Insurance Company, Amerisure Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Argonaut Insurance Company, Arrowood Indemnity Company, Aspen Specialty Insurance Company, Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company, Aviva PLC, Axis Specialty Insurance Company, Axis Surplus Insurance Company, Brighthouse Life Insurance Company, CNA Financial Corporation, Catlin Specialty Insurance Company, Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, Colony Insurance Company, Columbia Casualty Company, Columbia Insurance Company, Consolidated National Insurance Company, Continental Casualty Company, Crum & Forster Indemnity Company, Doe Defendants 1-100, Endurance American Insurance Company, Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company, Erie Family Life Insurance Company, Erie Insurance Exchange, Erie and Niagara Insurance Association, Evanston Insurance Company, Everest National Insurance Company, Firemans Fund Insurance Company, First Insurance Company of Hawaii, Ltd., Gemini Insurance Company, General Insurance Company of America, General Star Indemnity Company, Great American Assurance Company, Great American E & S Insurance Company, Great American Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Interstate Fire & Casualty Company, Jefferson Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Underwriters Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation, London and Edinburgh Insurance Company Limited, Munich Reinsurance America, Inc., National Casualty Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, National Surety Corporation, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, New Hampshire Insurance Company, Normandy Reinsurance Company Limited, Old Republic Insurance Company, Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company, Phoenix Insurance Company, QBE Insurance Corporation, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Scottsdale Insurance Company, Security Mutual Insurance Company, Sparta Insurance Company, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, St. Paul Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Swiss Re Corporate Solutions Capacity Insurance Corporation, TIG Insurance Company, Tenecom Limited, The Cincinnati Insurance Company, The Continental Insurance Company, The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, The North River Insurance Company, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, The Travelers Companies, Inc., The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers (Bermuda) Limited, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company, United States Fire Insurance Company, Universal Re-Insurance Company Limited, Utica Mutual Insurance Company, Wausau General Insurance Company, Westport Insurance Corporation, XL Bermuda Limited, XL Insurance Company SE. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s)) (ndt) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Barbara J. Houser. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Tillotson, Jeffrey) (Main Document 2 replaced to flatten on 7/18/2023) (ndt). (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Barbara J. Houser. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13889164) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet) (Tillotson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less