This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2023 at 09:01:04 (UTC).

Bass v. iHeartMedia, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/11/2023 Bass filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against iHeartMedia, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Orlando L. Garcia. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:23-CV-00600

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Orlando L. Garcia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gabriella Bass

Defendant

iHeartMedia, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James H. Freeman

Craig B. Sanders

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17425161), filed by Gabriella Bass. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Photographs, #2 Exhibit Infringing Use of the Photographs, #3 Exhibit DMCA Screengrab Infringement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit Original Photographs

1 #2

Exhibit Infringing Use of the Photographs

1 #3

Exhibit DMCA Screengrab Infringement

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Gabriella Bass. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James H. Freeman on behalf of Gabriella Bass. Attorney James H. Freeman added to party Gabriella Bass(pty:pla) (Freeman, James) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

#4

(#4) Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights. (nm) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to iHeartMedia, Inc.. (nm) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gabriella Bass. iHeartMedia, Inc. served on 5/19/2023, answer due 6/9/2023. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Settlement and Request for 30 Day Discontinuance of Action and Adjournment of Pending Dates Sine Die by Gabriella Bass (Freeman, James) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

#8

(#8) ORDER FOR DISMISSAL PAPERS--The parties shall submit a stipulation of dismissal or agreed judgment and any appropriate supporting documents on or before Friday, July 21, 2023. The Court hereby administratively CLOSES this case pending the filing of dismissal papers. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (nm) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gabriella Bass (Freeman, James) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gabriella Bass (Freeman, James) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ORDER FOR DISMISSAL PAPERS--The parties shall submit a stipulation of dismissal or agreed judgment and any appropriate supporting documents on or before Friday, July 21, 2023. The Court hereby administratively CLOSES this case pending the filing of dismissal papers. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (nm) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Settlement and Request for 30 Day Discontinuance of Action and Adjournment of Pending Dates Sine Die by Gabriella Bass (Freeman, James) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gabriella Bass. iHeartMedia, Inc. served on 5/19/2023, answer due 6/9/2023. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to iHeartMedia, Inc.. (nm) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights. (nm) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023

DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (nm) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023

DocketCase assigned to Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (nm) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James H. Freeman on behalf of Gabriella Bass. Attorney James H. Freeman added to party Gabriella Bass(pty:pla) (Freeman, James) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Gabriella Bass. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17425161), filed by Gabriella Bass. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Photographs, #2 Exhibit Infringing Use of the Photographs, #3 Exhibit DMCA Screengrab Infringement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less