This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/03/2023 at 07:37:18 (UTC).

XL Insurance America, Inc. et al v. Vensure HR, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/04/2023 XL Insurance America, Inc filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Vensure HR, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronnie Abrams. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-03782

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronnie Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

XL Insurance America, Inc.

XL Specialty Insurance Company

Defendant

Vensure HR, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Samuel Jay Thomas

Dennis Edward Kadian

Lauren Hadley Sobotka

Defendant Attorney

John Sandercock

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Civil Cover Sheet and Petition to Compel Compliance with Arbitration Subpoena served on Vensure HR, INC. on 05/10/2023. Service was accepted by Veronica Rigaud. Document filed by XL Insurance America, Inc., XL Specialty Insurance Company..(Kadian, Dennis) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Hadley Sobotka on behalf of XL Insurance America, Inc., XL Specialty Insurance Company..(Sobotka, Lauren) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dennis Edward Kadian on behalf of XL Insurance America, Inc., XL Specialty Insurance Company..(Kadian, Dennis) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

#5

(#5) ORDER This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. On May 4, 2023, Petitioners filed a complaint seeking to compel arbitration. ORDERED that Petitioners shall file and serve any additional materials with which they intend to support their petition to compel arbitration by May 29, 2023. Respondents opposition, if any, is due on June 12, 2023. Petitioners' reply, if any, is due on June 19, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioners shall serve a copy of this Order on Respondent. SO ORDERED. (Replies due by 6/19/2023., Responses due by 6/12/2023) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/15/2023) (jca) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

#12

(#12) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Vensure HR, Inc. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Vensure HR, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Sandercock, John) Modified on 5/30/2023 (km). (Entered: 05/26/2023)

#11

(#11) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #8 Letter filed by XL Specialty Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Petitioners shall file their submission no later than May 19, 2023, and Respondent shall file any opposition by May 26, 2023. Should Petitioners wish to file a reply, they may do so by June 2, 2023. If they do not intend to file a reply, they may notify the Court by letter. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/17/2023) (ate) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

#8

(#8) FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Dennis E. Kadian dated May 16, 2023 re: Expedited Schedule for Petition. Document filed by XL Insurance America, Inc., XL Specialty Insurance Company..(Kadian, Dennis) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Vensure HR, Inc. and without costs. Document filed by Vensure HR, Inc.. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(Sandercock, John) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Sandercock on behalf of Vensure HR, Inc...(Sandercock, John) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and among petitioners XL Insurance America, Inc., and XL Specialty Insurance Company and respondent Vensure HR, Inc., that the above-captioned action and all claims and defenses therein, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to any party. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/1/2023) (ate) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #13 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Ronnie Abrams for approval for the following reason(s): the stipulation of dismissal is not pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (km) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Vensure HR, Inc. and without costs. Document filed by Vensure HR, Inc.. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(Sandercock, John) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney John Sandercock. RE-FILE Document No. #12 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed by all parties who have appeared (handwritten signatures). The docket entry text needs to match the document. When re-filing do not select that the document is pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (Your document does not cite to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii)). Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (km) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Vensure HR, Inc. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Vensure HR, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Sandercock, John) Modified on 5/30/2023 (km). (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #8 Letter filed by XL Specialty Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Petitioners shall file their submission no later than May 19, 2023, and Respondent shall file any opposition by May 26, 2023. Should Petitioners wish to file a reply, they may do so by June 2, 2023. If they do not intend to file a reply, they may notify the Court by letter. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/17/2023) (ate) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Sandercock on behalf of Vensure HR, Inc...(Sandercock, John) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Civil Cover Sheet and Petition to Compel Compliance with Arbitration Subpoena served on Vensure HR, INC. on 05/10/2023. Service was accepted by Veronica Rigaud. Document filed by XL Insurance America, Inc., XL Specialty Insurance Company..(Kadian, Dennis) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Dennis E. Kadian dated May 16, 2023 re: Expedited Schedule for Petition. Document filed by XL Insurance America, Inc., XL Specialty Insurance Company..(Kadian, Dennis) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Hadley Sobotka on behalf of XL Insurance America, Inc., XL Specialty Insurance Company..(Sobotka, Lauren) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dennis Edward Kadian on behalf of XL Insurance America, Inc., XL Specialty Insurance Company..(Kadian, Dennis) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. On May 4, 2023, Petitioners filed a complaint seeking to compel arbitration. ORDERED that Petitioners shall file and serve any additional materials with which they intend to support their petition to compel arbitration by May 29, 2023. Respondents opposition, if any, is due on June 12, 2023. Petitioners' reply, if any, is due on June 19, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioners shall serve a copy of this Order on Respondent. SO ORDERED. (Replies due by 6/19/2023., Responses due by 6/12/2023) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/15/2023) (jca) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vensure HR, Inc.. (sj) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vensure HR, Inc., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by XL Insurance America, Inc., XL Specialty Insurance Company..(Thomas, Samuel) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Thomas, Samuel) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27700321).Document filed by XL Insurance America, Inc., XL Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Vensure Summons February 2023, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit of Service to Vensure, #3 Exhibit C-Vensure Amended Summons, #4 Exhibit D-Affidavit of Service of Amended Summons).(Thomas, Samuel) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less