This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/14/2023 at 13:36:53 (UTC).

A.B. v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 A B filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against United States Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Beth Bloom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-23554

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Bloom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A. B.

Defendants

United States Department of Homeland Security

United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

Secretary of The Department of Homeland Security

Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

Director of the USCIS Miami Asylum Office

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Brian Jacobi

Alice Carmen Burgos

Defendant Attorney

Noticing INS Attorney

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) ORDER ON MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL AND TO TEMPORARILY PROCEED UNDER A PSEUDONYM: Granting #1 Motion filed by A. B. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/20/2023. See attached document for full details. (scn) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

#9

(#9) ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE: Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that, within seven (7) days of perfecting service upon Defendants, Plaintiff shall file proof of such service with the Court. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/17/2023. See attached document for full details. (scn) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

#10

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

10/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Clerk's Notice to Filer re #11 Summons Returned Executed as to USA,. Incorrect Service Date Entered; ERROR - The incorrect service date was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see DE# 12 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (jas) (Entered: 10/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by A. B.. Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 10/6/2023, response/answer due 12/5/2023; Director of the USCIS Miami Asylum Office served on 10/6/2023, response/answer due 12/5/2023; Secretary of The Department of Homeland Security served on 10/6/2023, response/answer due 12/5/2023; United States Department of Homeland Security served on 10/6/2023, response/answer due 12/5/2023. US Attorney served on 10/2/2023, reponse/answer due 12/1/2023. US Attorney General served on 10/10/2023, reponse/answer due 12/11/2023. (See DE#11 for document images). (jas) (Entered: 10/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by A. B.. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proof of Service - DHS, #2 Supplement Proof of Service - Garland, #3 Supplement Proof of Service Jaddou, #4 Supplement Proof of Service - Mayorkas, #5 Supplement Proof of Service - Papazian)(Burgos, Alice) (Entered: 10/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(kpe) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE: Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that, within seven (7) days of perfecting service upon Defendants, Plaintiff shall file proof of such service with the Court. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/17/2023. See attached document for full details. (scn) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ORDER ON MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL AND TO TEMPORARILY PROCEED UNDER A PSEUDONYM: Granting #1 Motion filed by A. B. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/20/2023. See attached document for full details. (scn) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney William Brian Jacobi. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for William Brian Jacobi. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16930787 by AB. Responses due by 10/4/2023 (Attachments: #1 Certification PHV, #2 Text of Proposed Order PHV)(Burgos, Alice) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Defendants UR M JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, Varsenik Papazian, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. Attorney Noticing INS Attorney added to party UR M JADDOU(pty:dft), Attorney Noticing INS Attorney added to party ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS(pty:dft), Attorney Noticing INS Attorney added to party Varsenik Papazian(pty:dft), Attorney Noticing INS Attorney added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Noticing INS Attorney added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft). (jua) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Brian Jacobi, mailing date September 18, 2023. (cw) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to UR M JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, Varsenik Papazian, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, and United States Department of Homeland Security. (caw) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

Docket(#2) Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (caw) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16923151, filed by AB. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summon(s) DHS, #5 Summon(s) Garland, #6 Summon(s) Jaddou, #7 Summon(s) Mayorkas, #8 Summon(s) Papazian, #9 Summon(s) US Atty - Civil Process Clerk, #10 Summon(s) USCIS)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Burgos, Alice) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less