This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/17/2023 at 08:13:19 (UTC).

McLeod v. Medtronic, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2023 McLeod filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Medtronic, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarala V. Nagala and Robert A. Richardson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00648

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarala V. Nagala

Referral Judge

Robert A. Richardson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christie B. McLeod

Defendant

Medtronic, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher P. Anderson

Defendant Attorney

James O. Craven

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Christie B. McLeod by Christie B. McLeod (Anderson, Christopher) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

#17

(#17) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss until 7/11/2023 by Christie B. McLeod. (Anderson, Christopher) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

16 #5

Exhibit D

16 #4

Exhibit C

16 #3

Exhibit B

16 #2

Exhibit A

16 #1

Memorandum in Support

#16

(#16) MOTION to Dismiss by Medtronic, Inc..Responses due by 6/22/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Craven, James) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#14

(#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than June 1, 2023. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 5/23/23. (Marks, Joshua) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Medtronic, Inc. Regarding Planning Conference and Report (Craven, James) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Medtronic, Inc. of Pending Motions (Craven, James) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Medtronic, Inc. - Removal Statement (Craven, James) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

1 #5

Exhibit E - Copies of Additional State Court Filings

1 #4

Exhibit D - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to be filed in State Court

1 #3

Exhibit C - State Court Amount in Demand

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Docket

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketJUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • Docket(#20) ORDER. In light of Plaintiff's notice of dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 7/12/23. (Marks, Joshua) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Christie B. McLeod by Christie B. McLeod (Anderson, Christopher) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • DocketSet Deadline: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/11/2023. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadline as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/11/2023. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file any opposition to Defendant's motion to dismiss no later than July 11, 2023. It is further ORDERED the parties shall submit their Rule 26(f) meeting report no later than July 11, 2023. The parties are reminded that Local Rule of Civil Procedure 7(b)3 requires all motions for extension of time to be filed at least three business days prior to the deadline sought to be extended. If a motion is not filed by such deadline it must explain why it was not filed in compliance with this requirement. The instant motion was not filed three business days in advance of the deadline for Plaintiff's opposition to the motion to dismiss, nor does it explain why it was filed late. The parties are advised that any future motions that do not comply with all the requirements of Local Rule 7(b)3 will be denied. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 6/22/23. (Marks, Joshua) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss until 7/11/2023 by Christie B. McLeod. (Anderson, Christopher) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Dismiss by Medtronic, Inc..Responses due by 6/22/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Craven, James) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketAnswer deadline updated for Medtronic, Inc. to 6/1/2023. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than June 1, 2023. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 5/23/23. (Marks, Joshua) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/17/2023. Discovery due by 11/17/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 12/22/2023. Signed by Clerk on 5/18/2023. (Mendez, D) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketJudge Sarala V. Nagala and Judge Robert A. Richardson added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • Docket(#8) Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 5/18/23.(Hushin, Z.) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Disclosure Statement by Medtronic, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Medtronic plc for Medtronic, Inc.. (Craven, James) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Medtronic, Inc.. (Craven, James) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by James O. Craven on behalf of Medtronic, Inc. (Craven, James) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Medtronic, Inc. Regarding Planning Conference and Report (Craven, James) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Medtronic, Inc. of Pending Motions (Craven, James) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Medtronic, Inc. - Removal Statement (Craven, James) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Medtronic, Inc. from Superior Court of Connecticut, Judicial District of New London, case number KNL-CV23-6061623-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7352574, filed by Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Amount in Demand, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to be filed in State Court, #5 Exhibit E - Copies of Additional State Court Filings)(Craven, James) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less