This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/09/2023 at 10:36:17 (UTC).

Aljahmi et al v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 07/11/2023 Aljahmi filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jessica G. L. Clarke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-05919

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jessica G. L. Clarke

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tawfiq Aljahmi

Clinton's Exotic Plus Corp.

Defendants

United States of America

United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jess Martin Berkowitz

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) FILING ERROR DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27981170)Document filed by Tawfiq Aljahmi, Clinton's Exotic Plus Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit FNS letter 1/23/2023, #3 Exhibit Transaction Reports, #4 Exhibit FNS letter 2/24/2023, #5 Exhibit Attorney letter 3/3/2023, #6 Exhibit Final Agency Decision).(Berkowitz, Jess) Modified on 7/12/2023 (jgo). (Entered: 07/11/2023)

1 #1

Affidavit Declaration of Plaintiff

1 #2

Exhibit FNS letter 1/23/2023

1 #3

Exhibit Transaction Reports

1 #4

Exhibit FNS letter 2/24/2023

1 #5

Exhibit Attorney letter 3/3/2023

1 #6

Exhibit Final Agency Decision

#2

(#2) FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Tawfiq Aljahmi, Clinton's Exotic Plus Corp...(Berkowitz, Jess) Modified on 7/13/2023 (jgo). (Entered: 07/11/2023)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT against United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America. Document filed by Tawfiq Aljahmi, Clinton's Exotic Plus Corp...(Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, re: #4 Complaint, #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Tawfiq Aljahmi, Clinton's Exotic Plus Corp...(Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General..(gp) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on October 26, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. The conference will be held remotely by Microsoft Teams. All counsel must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules and Practices, which are available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ hon-jessica-g-l-clarke. All parties are required to register promptly as filing users on ECF. As further set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/26/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 7/14/2023) (tg) (Entered: 07/17/2023)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, Complaint,, served. United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service served on 7/18/2023, answer due 9/18/2023; United States of America served on 7/18/2023, answer due 9/18/2023. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Tawfiq Aljahmi; Clinton's Exotic Plus Corp...(Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, Complaint,, served. United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service served on 7/18/2023, answer due 9/18/2023; United States of America served on 7/18/2023, answer due 9/18/2023. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Tawfiq Aljahmi; Clinton's Exotic Plus Corp...(Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on October 26, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. The conference will be held remotely by Microsoft Teams. All counsel must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules and Practices, which are available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ hon-jessica-g-l-clarke. All parties are required to register promptly as filing users on ECF. As further set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/26/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 7/14/2023) (tg) (Entered: 07/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General..(gp) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, re: #4 Complaint, #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Tawfiq Aljahmi, Clinton's Exotic Plus Corp...(Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jess Martin Berkowitz to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons request must be linked to the properly filed pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) COMPLAINT against United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America. Document filed by Tawfiq Aljahmi, Clinton's Exotic Plus Corp...(Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jess Martin Berkowitz to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; there are two pleadings attached to the main document. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 7/17/2023. (jgo) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Tawfiq Aljahmi, Clinton's Exotic Plus Corp...(Berkowitz, Jess) Modified on 7/13/2023 (jgo). (Entered: 07/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) FILING ERROR DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27981170)Document filed by Tawfiq Aljahmi, Clinton's Exotic Plus Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit FNS letter 1/23/2023, #3 Exhibit Transaction Reports, #4 Exhibit FNS letter 2/24/2023, #5 Exhibit Attorney letter 3/3/2023, #6 Exhibit Final Agency Decision).(Berkowitz, Jess) Modified on 7/12/2023 (jgo). (Entered: 07/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less