This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2023 at 07:48:46 (UTC).

Daron et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/01/2023 Daron filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth Preston Deavers and Edmund A. Sargus. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-01821

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Preston Deavers

Presiding Judge

Edmund A. Sargus

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brian Daron

Elizabeth Daron

Defendant

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Donald Alan Lane

Defendant Attorney

Frank Stephen Carson

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fairfield County Common Pleas Court, case number 23CV285 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9448296), filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - state court pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Carson, Frank) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - state court pleadings

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Carson, Frank) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2023 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

#4

(#4) RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiffs Brian Daron, Elizabeth Daron. (Lane, Donald) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Brian Daron, Elizabeth Daron. (daf) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #5 Complaint filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Carson, Frank) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

#7

(#7) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Initial Disclosures due by 7/15/2023. Joinder of Parties/Motions to Amend due by 7/15/2023. Discovery due by 12/1/2023. (If the parties are unable to reach an agreement on any matter related to discovery, they are directed to arrange a conference with the Court). Dispositive motions due by 1/15/2024. Primary Expert due by 8/15/2023. Rebuttal Expert due by 11/15/2023. Defendant Primary Expert due by 10/15/2023. Settlement Demand due by 8/15/2023. Response to Settlement Demand due by 8/31/2023. Mediation Deadline: 11/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 6/9/2023. (vb) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

#8

(#8) RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Carson, Frank) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Carson, Frank) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Carson, Frank) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Carson, Frank) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Initial Disclosures due by 7/15/2023. Joinder of Parties/Motions to Amend due by 7/15/2023. Discovery due by 12/1/2023. (If the parties are unable to reach an agreement on any matter related to discovery, they are directed to arrange a conference with the Court). Dispositive motions due by 1/15/2024. Primary Expert due by 8/15/2023. Rebuttal Expert due by 11/15/2023. Defendant Primary Expert due by 10/15/2023. Settlement Demand due by 8/15/2023. Response to Settlement Demand due by 8/31/2023. Mediation Deadline: 11/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 6/9/2023. (vb) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE : The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2023 is VACATED. (Counsel confirmed via email that they agree to the deadlines set forth in the Rule 26(f) Report #4 and a PPTC is not necessary.) (sln) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #5 Complaint filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Carson, Frank) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Brian Daron, Elizabeth Daron. (daf) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiffs Brian Daron, Elizabeth Daron. (Lane, Donald) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2023 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Carson, Frank) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fairfield County Common Pleas Court, case number 23CV285 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9448296), filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - state court pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Carson, Frank) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less