This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/07/2023 at 07:57:28 (UTC).

Barnett v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 05/08/2023 Barnett filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions, Inc ,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mary S. Scriven and Christopher P. Tuite. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:23-CV-01017

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary S. Scriven

Referral Judge

Christopher P. Tuite

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vassel Q. Barnett

Defendants

TransUnion, LLC

TRAX Federal Credit Union

Receivables Management Partners, LLC

Possible Financial Inc.

Polk Auto Finance, Inc.

Bank of Missouri

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer Gomes Simil

Jibrael S. Hindi

Defendant Attorneys

Charlotte A. Long

Christopher Loyd Welter

Chelsey R. Pankratz

Zachary David Miller

John A.C. Guyton, III

Emily Yandle Rottmann

Jason Daniel Joffe

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) ORDER of DISMISSAL as to Defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC and Possible Financial Inc. only. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC and Possible Financial Inc. This case shall proceed in the normal course as to all remaining Defendants. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/6/2023. (EOJ) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

#30

(#30) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by TransUnion, LLC.(Long, Charlotte) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

#29

(#29) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendant Possible Financial Inc., Only by Vassel Q. Barnett (Simil, Jennifer) Modified to edit docke text on 7/5/2023 (HAI). (Entered: 07/05/2023)

#28

(#28) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC Only by Vassel Q. Barnett (Simil, Jennifer) (Modified on 6/29/2023 to edit docket text)(JDR). (Entered: 06/28/2023)

#27

(#27) ORDER of Dismissal as to Defendant Verizon Communications, Inc., only. This case shall proceed in the normal course as to all remaining Defendants. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/27/2023. (EOJ) (Entered: 06/27/2023)

#26

(#26) Defendant ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Polk Auto Finance, Inc..(Guyton, John) (Entered: 06/19/2023)

#25

(#25) NOTICE of settlement as to Defendant Verizon Communications Only by Vassel Q. Barnett (Simil, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

#24

(#24) ORDER of DISMISSAL as to Certain Defendants. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Defendants Austin Capital Bank and Experian Information Solutions, Inc. This case shall proceed in the normal course as to all remaining Defendants. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/15/2023. (EOJ) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

#23

(#23) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by TRAX Federal Credit Union. (Welter, Christopher) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

1 #11

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Defendant Bank of Missouri

1 #8

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Defendant Austin Capital Bank

1 #7

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Defendant Possible Financial Inc

1 #6

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Defendant TRAX Federal Credit Union

1 #5

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Defendant Receivables Management Partners,

1 #4

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC

1 #3

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Defendant TransUnion LLC

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER of DISMISSAL as to Defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC and Possible Financial Inc. only. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC and Possible Financial Inc. This case shall proceed in the normal course as to all remaining Defendants. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/6/2023. (EOJ) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by TransUnion, LLC.(Long, Charlotte) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendant Possible Financial Inc., Only by Vassel Q. Barnett (Simil, Jennifer) Modified to edit docke text on 7/5/2023 (HAI). (Entered: 07/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC Only by Vassel Q. Barnett (Simil, Jennifer) (Modified on 6/29/2023 to edit docket text)(JDR). (Entered: 06/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER of Dismissal as to Defendant Verizon Communications, Inc., only. This case shall proceed in the normal course as to all remaining Defendants. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/27/2023. (EOJ) (Entered: 06/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Defendant ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Polk Auto Finance, Inc..(Guyton, John) (Entered: 06/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of settlement as to Defendant Verizon Communications Only by Vassel Q. Barnett (Simil, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER of DISMISSAL as to Certain Defendants. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Defendants Austin Capital Bank and Experian Information Solutions, Inc. This case shall proceed in the normal course as to all remaining Defendants. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/15/2023. (EOJ) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by TRAX Federal Credit Union. (Welter, Christopher) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions Only by Vassel Q. Barnett (Simil, Jennifer) Modified on 6/8/2023 (LD). (Entered: 06/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Bank of Missouri. (Rottmann, Emily) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Related case(s): No (Joffe, Jason) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Joffe, Jason) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Joffe, Jason) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KAC) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS issued as to Austin Capital Bank, Bank of Missouri, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Polk Auto Finance, Inc., Possible Financial Inc., Receivables Management Partners, LLC, TRAX Federal Credit Union, TransUnion, LLC, Verizon Communications, Inc. (LD) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Vassel Q. Barnett. Related case(s): No (Simil, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jennifer Gomes Simil on behalf of Vassel Q. Barnett. Lead Counsel: Jennifer G. Simil. (Simil, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:23-cv-1017-MSS-CPT. (AET) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Austin Capital Bank, Bank of Missouri, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., Polk Auto Finance, Inc., Possible Financial Inc., Receivables Management Partners, LLC, TRAX Federal Credit Union, TransUnion, LLC, Verizon Communications, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20812019) filed by Vassel Q Barnett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons for Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc, #3 Proposed Summons for Defendant TransUnion LLC, #4 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC, #5 Proposed Summons for Defendant Receivables Management Partners, LLC, #6 Proposed Summons for Defendant TRAX Federal Credit Union, #7 Proposed Summons for Defendant Possible Financial Inc, #8 Proposed Summons for Defendant Austin Capital Bank, #9 Proposed Summons for Defendant Polk Auto Finance Inc, #10 Proposed Summons for Defendant Verizon Communications Inc, #11 Proposed Summons for Defendant Bank of Missouri)(Simil, Jennifer) Modified on 5/9/2023 (LD). (Entered: 05/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less