This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/21/2023 at 08:34:18 (UTC).

Hindson v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/22/2023 Hindson filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen H. Locher and William P. Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-00376

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen H. Locher

Referral Judge

William P. Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tomika Hindson

Defendant

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tomika Hindson. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 12/21/2023. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/21/2023. (btg) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tomika Hindson. (btg) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

 

Docket Entries

09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) TEXT ORDER Denying Without Prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The Court is aware that Plaintiff Tomika Hindson has entered settlements in other Fair Credit Reporting Act cases filed in this Court. She also may have entered settlements in cases in other Districts. Any payments she has received pursuant to these settlements must be disclosed as income from "[a]ny other sources" in response to Question 3(f) of the form Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Similarly, if she is entitled to receive payment in the future pursuant to a settlement agreement, such payment is a "financial instrument or thing of value" that must be disclosed in response to Question 5. Plaintiff is directed to file a supplemental Application disclosing all settlement payments she has received in the last twelve months or is legally entitled to receive in the future pursuant to a settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Stephen H. Locher on 9/25/2023. Text Order mailed to Plaintiff by chambers. (mm) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tomika Hindson. (btg) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tomika Hindson. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 12/21/2023. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/21/2023. (btg) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less