This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/22/2023 at 09:46:38 (UTC).

Rogero v. HOME DEPOT U.S.A. INC.

Case Summary

On 05/23/2023 Rogero filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HOME DEPOT U S A INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian J. Davis and Monte C. Richardson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00619

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian J. Davis

Referral Judge

Monte C. Richardson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason Rogero

Defendant

HOME DEPOT U.S.A. INC.

Not Classified By Court

Pamela Klavon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Arlen Mason Weintraub

Elie Anidjar

Glen B. Levine

Lawrence Allen Levine

Defendant Attorneys

Todd T. Springer

Deana Nicole Dunham

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Pamela Haddock Klavon

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Deana Nicole Dunham on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. Lead Counsel: Deana N. Dunham. (Dunham, Deana) Modified on 6/30/2023 to edit text (ABC). (Entered: 06/29/2023)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. (Dunham, Deana) Modified on 6/30/2023 to edit text (ABC). (Entered: 06/29/2023)

10 #2

Docket Sheets

10 #1

Mediation Report Form

#10

(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/12/2024; Conduct mediation hearing by 1/26/2024; Dispositive motions due by 2/9/2024; Pretrial statement due by 6/18/2024; Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2024 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis; Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 7/15/2024 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 6/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Report Form, #2 Docket Sheets)(AMP) (Entered: 06/27/2023)

#9

(#9) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Dunham, Deana) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Arlen Mason Weintraub on behalf of Jason Rogero (Weintraub, Arlen) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

#4

(#4) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. (Originally filed in State Court on 05/22/2023)(JDR) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Jason Rogero. (Originally filed in State Court on 03/18/2023)(JDR) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

1 #10

Exhibit E

1 #9

Exhibit D

1 #8

Exhibit C

1 #7

Exhibit B

1 #6

Exhibit A

1 #3

State Court Docket Sheet 3

1 #2

State Court ANSWER 2

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT 1

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Deana Nicole Dunham on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. Lead Counsel: Deana N. Dunham. (Dunham, Deana) Modified on 6/30/2023 to edit text (ABC). (Entered: 06/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. (Dunham, Deana) Modified on 6/30/2023 to edit text (ABC). (Entered: 06/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • DocketSet scheduling order deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/28/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 6/28/2023. All other motions due by 6/18/2024. Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 11/17/2023. Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 10/20/2023. (KNC) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/12/2024; Conduct mediation hearing by 1/26/2024; Dispositive motions due by 2/9/2024; Pretrial statement due by 6/18/2024; Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2024 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis; Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 7/15/2024 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 6/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Report Form, #2 Docket Sheets)(AMP) (Entered: 06/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Dunham, Deana) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Arlen Mason Weintraub on behalf of Jason Rogero (Weintraub, Arlen) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CKS) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL Elie Anidjar and Glen B. Levine of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JDR) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. (Originally filed in State Court on 05/22/2023)(JDR) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Jason Rogero. (Originally filed in State Court on 03/18/2023)(JDR) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:23-cv-619-BJB-MCR. (ARC) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Nassau County Circuit Court, case number 2023-CA-000103 filed in State Court on 03/18/2023. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-20863932 filed by HOME DEPOT U.S.A. INC.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT 1, #2 State Court ANSWER 2, #3 State Court Docket Sheet 3, #4 State Court Other Documents 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet 5, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E)(Dunham, Deana) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less