This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2023 at 09:13:54 (UTC).

TRIPALINK, CORP. et al v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2023 TRIPALINK, CORP filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Berman Jackson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-01566

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Berman Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRIPALINK, CORP.

PENG ZHANG

Defendants

UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES

JULIE SU

DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael E. Piston

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, JULIE SU, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10108102) filed by TRIPALINK, CORP., PENG ZHANG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Piston, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #6

Summons

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by TRIPALINK, CORP., PENG ZHANG. Case related to Case No. 2:23-03852. (Piston, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 2:23-03852. (Piston, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#4

(#4) ERRATA Exhibit A to Complaint by TRIPALINK, CORP. re #1 Complaint,. (Piston, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

5 #1

Notice and Consent

#6

(#6) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by TRIPALINK, CORP., PENG ZHANG. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Piston, Michael) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

6 #1

Statement of Facts

6 #2

Text of Proposed Order

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Piston, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by TRIPALINK, CORP., PENG ZHANG. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Piston, Michael) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zljn) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ERRATA Exhibit A to Complaint by TRIPALINK, CORP. re #1 Complaint,. (Piston, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 2:23-03852. (Piston, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by TRIPALINK, CORP., PENG ZHANG. Case related to Case No. 2:23-03852. (Piston, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to michaelpiston4@gmail.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing Related Case form. Please submit using the event Notice of Related Case., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zljn, ) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, JULIE SU, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10108102) filed by TRIPALINK, CORP., PENG ZHANG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Piston, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less