This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/07/2023 at 07:48:46 (UTC).

Ningbo Futai Electric Limited v. QVC, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/08/2023 Ningbo Futai Electric Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against QVC, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is KAI N. SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-01768

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KAI N. SCOTT

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Ningbo Futai Electric Limited

Defendant and Counter Claimant

QVC INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alan C Chen

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Brian J. Doyle

John Zaccaria

John K Rubiner

 

Court Documents

44 #1

*Restricted*

#44

(#44) Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 5:22-cv-02015. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 05/09/2023)

#43

(#43) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS #28 , #29 . Defendants motion to transfer the case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania is granted. The Court directs the Clerk to effect the transfer and close the case pending in this district. In the interest of comity, the Court declines to adjudicate Defendants motion for judgment on the pleadings in order to give the transferee court the opportunity to resolve themotion. (Entire case electronically sent to USDC Eastern Pennyslvania on 5/8/2023). MD JS-6. Case Terminated.. (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 5/9/2023.] (Entered: 05/08/2023)

29 #2

Declaration

29 #1

Memorandum

#29

(#38) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to on the pleadings #29 filed by Plaintiff Ningbo Futai Electric Limited. (Chen, Alan) [Transferred from California Central on 5/9/2023.] (Entered: 03/27/2023)

28 #2

Declaration Decl of Doyle ISO Mtn for Transfer

28 #1

Memorandum ISO Def's Mtn for Transfer

#28

(#41) MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Mark C. Scarsi: RE Motion to Transfer to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania #28 and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #29 . Counsel address the Court. The Court takes the Motions UNDER SUBMISSION and a ruling will be issued. Court Recorder: CourtSmart. (lc) Modified on 4/17/2023 (lc). [Transferred from California Central on 5/9/2023.] (Entered: 04/17/2023)

1 #11

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#44) Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 5:22-cv-02015. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 05/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#43) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS #28 , #29 . Defendants motion to transfer the case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania is granted. The Court directs the Clerk to effect the transfer and close the case pending in this district. In the interest of comity, the Court declines to adjudicate Defendants motion for judgment on the pleadings in order to give the transferee court the opportunity to resolve themotion. (Entire case electronically sent to USDC Eastern Pennyslvania on 5/8/2023). MD JS-6. Case Terminated.. (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 5/9/2023.] (Entered: 05/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#42) TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendant QVC, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Elizabeth Rubio at erubio@fmglaw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Rubiner, John) [Transferred from California Central on 5/9/2023.] (Entered: 04/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#41) MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Mark C. Scarsi: RE Motion to Transfer to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania #28 and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #29 . Counsel address the Court. The Court takes the Motions UNDER SUBMISSION and a ruling will be issued. Court Recorder: CourtSmart. (lc) Modified on 4/17/2023 (lc). [Transferred from California Central on 5/9/2023.] (Entered: 04/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#40) REPLY in support of Defendant QVC, Inc.'s Motion for Judgement on the Pleadings filed by Defendant QVC, Inc.. (Rubiner, John) [Transferred from California Central on 5/9/2023.] (Entered: 04/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#39) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER RE STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motions for Transfer of Venue and For Judgment on the Pleading #37 . The stipulation is DENIED. The parties fail to explain in any detail why they are unable to adhere to the Court's standard briefing schedule. At this time, the hearing for the motions will remain set for April 17, 2023. (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 5/9/2023.] (Entered: 03/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#38) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to on the pleadings #29 filed by Plaintiff Ningbo Futai Electric Limited. (Chen, Alan) [Transferred from California Central on 5/9/2023.] (Entered: 03/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#37) Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motions for Transfer of Venue and For Judgment on the Pleading from 04/17/2023 to 05/15/20223 filed by Plaintiff Ningbo Futai Electric Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Joint Stipulation for Continuance of Hearing on Motions for Transfer of Venue and for Judgment on the Pleading)(Chen, Alan) [Transferred from California Central on 5/9/2023.] (Entered: 03/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#36) ORDER DENYING REQUEST for Leave of John Zaccaria and Brian J. Doyle to Appear Telephonically at scheduling conference on 4/3/2023 10:00 AM filed by defendant QVC, Inc #31 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lc) Modified on 3/22/2023 (lc). [Transferred from California Central on 5/9/2023.] (Entered: 03/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023

Docket(#35) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on April 3, 2023 is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar and under submission. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo) [Transferred from California Central on 5/9/2023.] (Entered: 03/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
11/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Ningbo Futai Electric Limited. (Chen, Alan) [Transferred from California Central on 5/9/2023.] (Entered: 11/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ningbo Futai Electric Limited, identifying Ningbo Futai Electric Limited and QVC, Inc.. (Chen, Alan) [Transferred from California Central on 5/9/2023.] (Entered: 11/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 11 Civil Cover Sheet should be e-filed separately. The correct event category is located under Civil Events - Other Filings - Miscellaneous Filings. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 5/9/2023.] (Entered: 11/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant QVC, Inc. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 5/9/2023.] (Entered: 11/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 5/9/2023.] (Entered: 11/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 5/9/2023.] (Entered: 11/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 5/9/2023.] (Entered: 11/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 5/9/2023.] (Entered: 11/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Ningbo Futai Electric Limited. (Chen, Alan) [Transferred from California Central on 5/9/2023.] (Entered: 11/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34321860 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Ningbo Futai Electric Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Alan C Chen added to party Ningbo Futai Electric Limited(pty:pla))(Chen, Alan) [Transferred from California Central on 5/9/2023.] (Entered: 11/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less