This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/12/2023 at 09:08:40 (UTC).

Chesser v. Arch Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/13/2023 Chesser filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Arch Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Gray M Borden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-01217

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gray M Borden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kimberly Chesser

Defendant

Arch Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael E Eldridge

Defendant Attorney

Jud Clifford Stanford

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Arch Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2023-902790.00. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(ASL) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Arch Insurance Company.(Stanford, Jud) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

#3

(#3) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on September 14, 2023. (ASL) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#4

(#4) ORDER that parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge no later than 10/30/23; Telephone Conference set for 10/18/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden; parties are directed to dial 205-931-0422, phone conference ID 820 954 979; telephone conference will be cancelled if all parties submit forms in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on September 14, 2023. (ASL) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#6

(#6) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (RMM) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

#8

(#8) INITIAL ORDER - GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on October 12, 2023. (ASL) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

#9

(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Stanford, Jud) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER This order is entered under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) based on the parties' report of a planning meeting. This order governs further proceedings in this action unless modified for good cause shown. Dispositive Motions: All potentially dispositive motions must be filed no later than 8/28/2024. Deadline: All discovery must be commenced in time to be completed by 7/12/2024. Trial: The parties shall be ready for trial, to be scheduled by separate order, on or before December 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 10/24/2023. (RMM) (Entered: 10/24/2023)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER This order is entered under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) based on the parties' report of a planning meeting. This order governs further proceedings in this action unless modified for good cause shown. Dispositive Motions: All potentially dispositive motions must be filed no later than 8/28/2024. Deadline: All discovery must be commenced in time to be completed by 7/12/2024. Trial: The parties shall be ready for trial, to be scheduled by separate order, on or before December 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 10/24/2023. (RMM) (Entered: 10/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Stanford, Jud) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) INITIAL ORDER - GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on October 12, 2023. (ASL) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023

Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER: The Telephone Conference scheduled for 10/18/2023 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 10/12/2023. (CMD) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (RMM) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023

Docket(#5) NOTICE to remind parties of consent conference scheduled at 10:00 a.m. on 10/18/2023; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, the conference will be cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 10/11/2023. (CMD) (Entered: 10/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ORDER that parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge no later than 10/30/23; Telephone Conference set for 10/18/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden; parties are directed to dial 205-931-0422, phone conference ID 820 954 979; telephone conference will be cancelled if all parties submit forms in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on September 14, 2023. (ASL) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on September 14, 2023. (ASL) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4426812. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Arch Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2023-902790.00. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(ASL). (Stanford, Jud) Modified on 9/14/2023 - Receipt No: B-7395 (ASL). (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Arch Insurance Company.(Stanford, Jud) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Arch Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2023-902790.00. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(ASL) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less