This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2023 at 07:59:08 (UTC).

Johnson v. Securities Exchange Commission et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2023 Johnson filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Securities Exchange Commission. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robin L. Rosenberg and Panayotta D Augustin-Birch. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:23-CV-60918

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

Referral Judge

Panayotta D Augustin-Birch

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Judy A. Johnson

Defendants

Securities Exchange Commission

U.S. Department of Justice

U.S. Attorney General

U.S. Attorney

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) MOTION to Withdraw Motion for Summary Judgment As Now Moot re: #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Judy A. Johnson. Responses due by 7/19/2023 (pcs) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

#15

(#15) RULE 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Parties by Judy A. Johnson identifying Other Affiliate Ms. Kelly, Other Affiliate M. Garland, Other Affiliate M. La Pointe for Judy A. Johnson (cds) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

14 #1

Exhibit

#14

(#14) NOTICE to the Clerk of Current Address of this Plaintiff (Address Previously Updated) by Judy A. Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (cds) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

#12

(#12) ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANTS. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/27/2023. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 06/27/2023)

11 #2

Exhibits

11 #1

Affidavit

#11

(#11) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Judy A. Johnson. Responses due by 7/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibits)(scn) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

#10

(#10) AFFIDAVIT in Support- Exhibit A signed by: Judy A. Johnson re #9 Proof of Service by Judy A. Johnson (cds) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

9 #1

Exhibit

#9

(#9) STATUS OF: Proof of Service of Amended Complaint, et al filed by Judy A. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cds) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

8 #1

Exhibit

#8

(#8) MOTION to Amend the #1 Complaint and/or Affidavit and/or Exhibits by Judy A. Johnson. Responses due by 6/15/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cds) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT in Support of signed by: Judy A. Johnson re #6 Proof of Service of Process/Summons Returned Executed as to USA,, by Judy A. Johnson (cds) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Affidavit

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #11 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Document #16 was granted, rendering Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment moot. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (dt00) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Motion to Withdraw Document. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (dt00) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Withdraw Motion for Summary Judgment As Now Moot re: #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Judy A. Johnson. Responses due by 7/19/2023 (pcs) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RULE 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Parties by Judy A. Johnson identifying Other Affiliate Ms. Kelly, Other Affiliate M. Garland, Other Affiliate M. La Pointe for Judy A. Johnson (cds) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE to the Clerk of Current Address of this Plaintiff (Address Previously Updated) by Judy A. Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (cds) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PAPERLESS ORDER denying #8 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff is reminded that, under Local Rule 15.1, Any amendment to a pleading, whether filed as a matter of course or upon a successful motion to amend, must, except by leave of Court, reproduce the entire pleading as amended, and may not incorporate any prior pleading by reference. Plaintiffs Motion appears to be an attempt to supplement her original complaint rather than file an amended complaint that complies with Local Rule 15.1. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (dt00) (Entered: 06/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANTS. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/27/2023. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 06/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Judy A. Johnson. Responses due by 7/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibits)(scn) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT in Support- Exhibit A signed by: Judy A. Johnson re #9 Proof of Service by Judy A. Johnson (cds) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATUS OF: Proof of Service of Amended Complaint, et al filed by Judy A. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cds) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Amend the #1 Complaint and/or Affidavit and/or Exhibits by Judy A. Johnson. Responses due by 6/15/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cds) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT in Support of signed by: Judy A. Johnson re #6 Proof of Service of Process/Summons Returned Executed as to USA,, by Judy A. Johnson (cds) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATUS OF: Proof of Service/SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Judy A. Johnson. Securities Exchange Commission served on 5/22/2023, response/answer due 7/21/2023; U.S. Department of Justice served on 5/22/2023, response/answer due 7/21/2023., filed by Judy A. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cds) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE to Panayotta Augustin-Birch for Discovery AND ORDER OF COURT-MANDATED REQUIREMENTS ON SERVICE, DEFAULTS, AND JOINT SCHEDULING REPORTS. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/17/2023. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Securities Exchange Commission, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Department of Justice. (ebz) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 5/17/2023 in the amount of $ 402.00, receipt number 16848. (ebz) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and US Magistrate Judge Panayotta D Augustin-Birch. (ebz) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Securities Exchange Commission, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice. Filing fees $ 402.00. Paid. Receipt#: 16848, filed by Judy A. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ebz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2023: #3 Exhibit) (ebz). (Entered: 05/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less