This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/31/2023 at 08:19:57 (UTC).

Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC et al v. Lupin Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2023 Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Lupin Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher J. Burke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00964

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher J. Burke

 

Party Details

Counter Defendants and Plaintiffs

Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC

Amicus Therapeutics, Inc.

Counter Claimants and Defendants

Lupin Ltd.

Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Chad S.C. Stover

Christina M. Baugh

Joshua E. Ney

Mark C. Nelson

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorney

John C. Phillips, Jr.

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Case Management Checklist to November 15, 2023 - filed by Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC, Amicus Therapeutics, Inc.. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 10/16/2023)

#17

(#17) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John W. Cox, Ph.D., Mark C. Nelson, Christina M. Baugh, Joshua E. Ney, Ph.D., Heather B. Repicky, Joshua M. Kalb, Lauren Baker and Anna Whitacre - filed by Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC, Amicus Therapeutics, Inc.. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 10/03/2023)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC, Amicus Therapeutics, Inc..(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lupin Limited and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s [CONFIDENTIAL] Amended Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures and Lupin Limited and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s [CONFIDENTIAL] Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Bilson, David) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Plaintiffs Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC and Amicus Therapeutics, Inc.'s Disclosure Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery and 2) Plaintiffs Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC and Amicus Therapeutics, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC, Amicus Therapeutics, Inc..(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 09/28/2023)

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC and Amicus Therapeutics, Inc.'s Preliminary Disclosure of Asserted Claims filed by Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC, Amicus Therapeutics, Inc..(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

#9

(#16) ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC, Amicus Therapeutics, Inc..(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

#3

(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: August 10, 2023. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 2/10/2026. (jfm) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jfm) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4214674.) - filed by Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC, Amicus Therapeutics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(jfm) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/20/2023

DocketPro Hac Vice Attorneys Joshua E. Ney, Mark C. Nelson, and Christina M. Baugh for Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC and Amicus Therapeutics, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb) (Entered: 10/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSO ORDERED D.I. #17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John W. Cox, Ph.D., Mark C. Nelson, Christina M. Baugh, Joshua E. Ney, Ph.D., Heather B. Repicky, Joshua M. Kalb, Lauren Baker and Anna Whitacre filed by Amicus Therapeutics, Inc., Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/18/2023. (dlb) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSO ORDERED D.I. #18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Case Management Checklist to November 15, 2023 filed by Amicus Therapeutics, Inc., Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/17/2023. (dlb) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Case Management Checklist to November 15, 2023 - filed by Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC, Amicus Therapeutics, Inc.. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 10/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John W. Cox, Ph.D., Mark C. Nelson, Christina M. Baugh, Joshua E. Ney, Ph.D., Heather B. Repicky, Joshua M. Kalb, Lauren Baker and Anna Whitacre - filed by Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC, Amicus Therapeutics, Inc.. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 10/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC, Amicus Therapeutics, Inc..(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lupin Limited and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s [CONFIDENTIAL] Amended Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures and Lupin Limited and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s [CONFIDENTIAL] Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Bilson, David) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Plaintiffs Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC and Amicus Therapeutics, Inc.'s Disclosure Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery and 2) Plaintiffs Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC and Amicus Therapeutics, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC, Amicus Therapeutics, Inc..(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 09/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC and Amicus Therapeutics, Inc.'s Preliminary Disclosure of Asserted Claims filed by Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC, Amicus Therapeutics, Inc..(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

Docket(#12) ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and discuss, in person and/or by telephone, each of the matters listed on Judge Burke's Case Management Checklist (Checklist). Within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the parties shall jointly file the following: (i) a copy of the Checklist, indicating the names of Lead Counsel and Delaware Counsel for each party; (ii) a proposed Scheduling Order, which is consistent with Judge Burke's "Rule 16 Scheduling Order - Patent" (and with additional changes made to accommodate the fact that this is an ANDA litigation matter); and (iii) a letter, not to exceed three pages, that contains the following: (a) a description of what this case is about; (b) the parties' positions regarding any disputes in the proposed Scheduling Order, and (c) a list of the three most significant topics (other than Scheduling Order disputes) discussed during the parties review of the Checklist items, along with a brief description as to what was discussed as to those topics. Thereafter, the Court may schedule a Case Management Conference/Rule 16 Scheduling Conference to be held with Judge Burke. The Checklist and Scheduling Order can be found on Judge Burke's portion of the District Court's website. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 9/25/2023. (dlb) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC, Amicus Therapeutics, Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/19/2023. (nmf) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketORAL ORDER: It is HEREBY ORDERED that on or before 2 weeks following the entry of appearance by the Defendants, the parties shall either (1) submit to the Clerk of Court an executed Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge, indicating their consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case including trial, the entry of final judgment, and post-trial proceedings; or (2) file a joint letter indicating that all the parties do not consent to a referral of this action to a Magistrate Judge. The letter should not indicate which party or parties did not consent. If all the parties consent, the case will be referred to Magistrate Judge Burke. Because of the Court's caseload, if the parties do not consent, the Court intends to assign the case to a visiting judge from another district. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/7/2023. (nmf) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Lupin Ltd. and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 9/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.)(jfm) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed for Amicus Therapeutics, Inc. filed by Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC, Amicus Therapeutics, Inc. (jfm) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Amicus Therapeutics, Inc. for Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC filed by Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC, Amicus Therapeutics, Inc. (jfm) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,000,011; 9,987,263; 10,383,864; 10,406,143; 10,925,866; 10,813,921; RE48,608. (jfm) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: August 10, 2023. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 2/10/2026. (jfm) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jfm) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4214674.) - filed by Amicus Therapeutics US, LLC, Amicus Therapeutics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(jfm) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less