This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/18/2023 at 08:39:35 (UTC).

Tripalink, Corp., et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 Tripalink, Corp , filed an Other lawsuit against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Margo A. Rocconi. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-03852

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

Referral Judge

Margo A. Rocconi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tripalink, Corp.

Peng Zhang

Defendant

United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Arthur Minas

Michael E. Piston

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Tripalink, Corp., Peng Zhang. Dismissal is Without prejudice. (Minas, Arthur) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

#17

(#17) ORDER CONTINUING IN-PERSON HEARING ON APPLICATION TO PROCEED PRO HAC VICE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' counsel Michael Piston's request to appear remotely at the PHV hearing #14 , #16 . The Court will, however, accommodate one final concern raised by Mr. Piston--that the June 2 PHV hearing is set on the same day as a longstanding personal commitment. Accordingly, the Court CONTINUES the in-person hearing on Mr. Piston's PHV application #7 to 6/9/2023 at 8:30 AM. In light of Mr. Piston's submissions, the Court also ORDERS Mr. Minas to appear at the hearing. See document for further details. (gk) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

16 #2

Declaration of Michael E. Piston

16 #1

Proposed Order

#16

(#16) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to To appear telephonically or virtually at the hearing of June 2, 2023 filed by plaintiff Tripalink, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Michael E. Piston) (Piston, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

#15

(#15) REQUEST to Withdraw Motion for Preliminary Injunction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re POSTPONING EFFECTIVENESS OF DENIAL #6 filed by plaintiff Tripalink, Corp.. (Piston, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to To appear telephonically or virtually at the hearing of June 2, 2023 filed by plaintiff Tripalink, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Michael E. Piston added to party Tripalink, Corp.(pty:pla)) (Piston, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

#12

(#12) CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

#11

(#11) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 CPC) (jtil) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

7 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael E. Piston to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation, PENG ZHANG (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35345405) filed by Plaintiff TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation, PENG ZHANG. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Minas, Arthur) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

6 #3

Exhibit

6 #2

Proposed Order

6 #1

Memorandum

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re POSTPONING EFFECTIVENESS OF DENIAL filed by Plaintiff TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation, PENG ZHANG. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit) (Minas, Arthur) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35344355 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation, PENG ZHANG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Attorney Arthur Minas added to party TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Arthur Minas added to party PENG ZHANG(pty:pla))(Minas, Arthur) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Tripalink, Corp., Peng Zhang. Dismissal is Without prejudice. (Minas, Arthur) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER CONTINUING IN-PERSON HEARING ON APPLICATION TO PROCEED PRO HAC VICE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' counsel Michael Piston's request to appear remotely at the PHV hearing #14 , #16 . The Court will, however, accommodate one final concern raised by Mr. Piston--that the June 2 PHV hearing is set on the same day as a longstanding personal commitment. Accordingly, the Court CONTINUES the in-person hearing on Mr. Piston's PHV application #7 to 6/9/2023 at 8:30 AM. In light of Mr. Piston's submissions, the Court also ORDERS Mr. Minas to appear at the hearing. See document for further details. (gk) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to To appear telephonically or virtually at the hearing of June 2, 2023 filed by plaintiff Tripalink, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Michael E. Piston) (Piston, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REQUEST to Withdraw Motion for Preliminary Injunction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re POSTPONING EFFECTIVENESS OF DENIAL #6 filed by plaintiff Tripalink, Corp.. (Piston, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to To appear telephonically or virtually at the hearing of June 2, 2023 filed by plaintiff Tripalink, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Michael E. Piston added to party Tripalink, Corp.(pty:pla)) (Piston, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Setting Hearing on PHV Application #7 by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court SETS an in-person hearing at 8:30 a.m. on June 2, 2023 in Courtroom 6C on the application of Plaintiffs' counsel Michael Piston to appear pro hac vice. Counsel should be prepared to address his filing of a preliminary injunction motion without noticing a hearing and without addressing Rule 65(a)(1)'s requirement that "[t]he court may issue a preliminary injunction only on notice to the adverse party."THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 CPC) (jtil) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (jtil) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael E. Piston to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation, PENG ZHANG (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35345405) filed by Plaintiff TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation, PENG ZHANG. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Minas, Arthur) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re POSTPONING EFFECTIVENESS OF DENIAL filed by Plaintiff TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation, PENG ZHANG. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit) (Minas, Arthur) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Summons Request #3 , Summons Request #4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation, PENG ZHANG. (Minas, Arthur) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Summons Request #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation, PENG ZHANG. (Minas, Arthur) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation, PENG ZHANG. (Minas, Arthur) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation, PENG ZHANG. (Minas, Arthur) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35344355 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation, PENG ZHANG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Attorney Arthur Minas added to party TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Arthur Minas added to party PENG ZHANG(pty:pla))(Minas, Arthur) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less