2:23-CV-03852
05/19/2023
Disposed - Other Disposed
Other
Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr
Margo A. Rocconi
Tripalink, Corp.
Peng Zhang
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Arthur Minas
Michael E. Piston
(#18) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Tripalink, Corp., Peng Zhang. Dismissal is Without prejudice. (Minas, Arthur) (Entered: 05/31/2023)
(#17) ORDER CONTINUING IN-PERSON HEARING ON APPLICATION TO PROCEED PRO HAC VICE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' counsel Michael Piston's request to appear remotely at the PHV hearing #14 , #16 . The Court will, however, accommodate one final concern raised by Mr. Piston--that the June 2 PHV hearing is set on the same day as a longstanding personal commitment. Accordingly, the Court CONTINUES the in-person hearing on Mr. Piston's PHV application #7 to 6/9/2023 at 8:30 AM. In light of Mr. Piston's submissions, the Court also ORDERS Mr. Minas to appear at the hearing. See document for further details. (gk) (Entered: 05/23/2023)
Declaration of Michael E. Piston
Proposed Order
(#16) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to To appear telephonically or virtually at the hearing of June 2, 2023 filed by plaintiff Tripalink, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Michael E. Piston) (Piston, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2023)
(#15) REQUEST to Withdraw Motion for Preliminary Injunction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re POSTPONING EFFECTIVENESS OF DENIAL #6 filed by plaintiff Tripalink, Corp.. (Piston, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2023)
Proposed Order
(#14) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to To appear telephonically or virtually at the hearing of June 2, 2023 filed by plaintiff Tripalink, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Michael E. Piston added to party Tripalink, Corp.(pty:pla)) (Piston, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2023)
(#12) CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
(#11) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 CPC) (jtil) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
Certificate of Good Standing
Proposed Order
(#7) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael E. Piston to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation, PENG ZHANG (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35345405) filed by Plaintiff TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation, PENG ZHANG. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Minas, Arthur) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
Exhibit
Proposed Order
Memorandum
(#6) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re POSTPONING EFFECTIVENESS OF DENIAL filed by Plaintiff TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation, PENG ZHANG. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit) (Minas, Arthur) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35344355 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation, PENG ZHANG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Attorney Arthur Minas added to party TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Arthur Minas added to party PENG ZHANG(pty:pla))(Minas, Arthur) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
Docket(#18) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Tripalink, Corp., Peng Zhang. Dismissal is Without prejudice. (Minas, Arthur) (Entered: 05/31/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#17) ORDER CONTINUING IN-PERSON HEARING ON APPLICATION TO PROCEED PRO HAC VICE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' counsel Michael Piston's request to appear remotely at the PHV hearing #14 , #16 . The Court will, however, accommodate one final concern raised by Mr. Piston--that the June 2 PHV hearing is set on the same day as a longstanding personal commitment. Accordingly, the Court CONTINUES the in-person hearing on Mr. Piston's PHV application #7 to 6/9/2023 at 8:30 AM. In light of Mr. Piston's submissions, the Court also ORDERS Mr. Minas to appear at the hearing. See document for further details. (gk) (Entered: 05/23/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#16) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to To appear telephonically or virtually at the hearing of June 2, 2023 filed by plaintiff Tripalink, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Michael E. Piston) (Piston, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#15) REQUEST to Withdraw Motion for Preliminary Injunction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re POSTPONING EFFECTIVENESS OF DENIAL #6 filed by plaintiff Tripalink, Corp.. (Piston, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#14) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to To appear telephonically or virtually at the hearing of June 2, 2023 filed by plaintiff Tripalink, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Michael E. Piston added to party Tripalink, Corp.(pty:pla)) (Piston, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#13) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Setting Hearing on PHV Application #7 by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court SETS an in-person hearing at 8:30 a.m. on June 2, 2023 in Courtroom 6C on the application of Plaintiffs' counsel Michael Piston to appear pro hac vice. Counsel should be prepared to address his filing of a preliminary injunction motion without noticing a hearing and without addressing Rule 65(a)(1)'s requirement that "[t]he court may issue a preliminary injunction only on notice to the adverse party."THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/22/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#12) CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#11) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 CPC) (jtil) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (jtil) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael E. Piston to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation, PENG ZHANG (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35345405) filed by Plaintiff TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation, PENG ZHANG. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Minas, Arthur) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re POSTPONING EFFECTIVENESS OF DENIAL filed by Plaintiff TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation, PENG ZHANG. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit) (Minas, Arthur) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Summons Request #3 , Summons Request #4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation, PENG ZHANG. (Minas, Arthur) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Summons Request #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation, PENG ZHANG. (Minas, Arthur) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation, PENG ZHANG. (Minas, Arthur) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation, PENG ZHANG. (Minas, Arthur) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35344355 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation, PENG ZHANG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Attorney Arthur Minas added to party TRIPALINK, CORP, a Delaware Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Arthur Minas added to party PENG ZHANG(pty:pla))(Minas, Arthur) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
[-] Read Less