This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2023 at 07:59:30 (UTC).

MCPHILLIP v. MAGOON et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2023 MCPHILLIP filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against MAGOON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Renee Marie Bumb and Elizabeth A. Pascal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-02663

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Renee Marie Bumb

Referral Judge

Elizabeth A. Pascal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARLENE MCPHILLIP

Defendants

KATHLEEN M. MAGOON

ROBERT G. MALESTEIN

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC doing business as MR. COOPER

ALLIED FIRST BANK, SB doing business as SERVBANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

KATHLEEN M. MAGOON

BRIAN PETER SCIBETTA

BRIAN MICHAEL GILBERT

JOSEPH M. LABUDA

MICHAEL C. MULE

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER Granting Defendant Allied First Bank, SB's #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer; the deadline for Defendant to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to August 7, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 7/13/2023. (mag, N.M.) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL C. MULE on behalf of ALLIED FIRST BANK, SB (MULE, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

16 #4

Certificate of Service

16 #3

Text of Proposed Order

16 #2

Exhibit A-M

16 #1

Brief

#16

(#16) First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by KATHLEEN M. MAGOON. Responses due by 8/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A-M, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(MAGOON, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

15 #9

Exhibit E

15 #3

Brief in Support of Motion

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH M. LABUDA on behalf of ALLIED FIRST BANK, SB (LABUDA, JOSEPH) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALLIED FIRST BANK, SB, KATHLEEN M. MAGOON, ROBERT G. MALESTEIN, NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jab) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

#2

(#2) Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (jab) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

1 #5

Text of Proposed Order

1 #4

Certificate of Service

1 #3

Consent to Receive Documents Electronically

1 #2

Application IFP

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

COMPLAINT filed. Please see docket entry #1 for Complaint against ALLIED FIRST BANK, SB, KATHLEEN M. MAGOON, ROBERT G. MALESTEIN, NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC with JURY DEMAND, filed by CARLENE MCPHILLIP.(jab) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of #18 Order forwarded to Plaintiff via regular mail on 7/13/2023. (mag) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER Granting Defendant Allied First Bank, SB's #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer; the deadline for Defendant to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to August 7, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 7/13/2023. (mag, N.M.) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL C. MULE on behalf of ALLIED FIRST BANK, SB (MULE, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #16 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Motion set for 8/7/2023 before Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mag) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by KATHLEEN M. MAGOON. Responses due by 8/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A-M, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(MAGOON, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Motion set for 8/7/2023 before Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jab) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC. Responses due by 7/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Brief in Support of Motion, #4 Declaration of Brian M. Gilbert, Esq., #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H)(GILBERT, BRIAN) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The document #13 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by KATHLEEN M. MAGOON has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/11/2023. (mag) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALLIED FIRST BANK, SB, KATHLEEN M. MAGOON, ROBERT G. MALESTEIN, NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC, filed by CARLENE MCPHILLIP.(Received via ECF Help Desk) (dmr) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Kathleen M. Magoon, Esquire. Attorney KATHLEEN M. MAGOON for KATHLEEN M. MAGOON added. (MAGOON, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (GILBERT, BRIAN) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN PETER SCIBETTA on behalf of NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC (SCIBETTA, BRIAN) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN MICHAEL GILBERT on behalf of NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC (GILBERT, BRIAN) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer until August 7, 2023 by ALLIED FIRST BANK, SB. (LABUDA, JOSEPH) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH M. LABUDA on behalf of ALLIED FIRST BANK, SB (LABUDA, JOSEPH) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALLIED FIRST BANK, SB, KATHLEEN M. MAGOON, ROBERT G. MALESTEIN, NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jab) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT filed. Please see docket entry #1 for Complaint against ALLIED FIRST BANK, SB, KATHLEEN M. MAGOON, ROBERT G. MALESTEIN, NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC with JURY DEMAND, filed by CARLENE MCPHILLIP.(jab) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 402, receipt number TRE132679 (jab) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (jab) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application IFP, #3 Consent to Receive Documents Electronically, #4 Certificate of Service)(jab) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2023: #5 Text of Proposed Order) (jab, ). (Entered: 05/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less