This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/17/2023 at 13:20:51 (UTC).

Ragas v. Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2023 Ragas filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael North and Eldon E. Fallon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-05369

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael North

Presiding Judge

Eldon E. Fallon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ellery Ragas

Defendants

Anco Insulations, Inc.

Elliott Company

Flowserve US Inc

General Electric Company

Goulds Pumps, LLC

Gulf Engineering Company, LLC

Honeywell International, Inc.

ITT, LLC

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Louisiana Insurance Guarantee Association

Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc.

Paramount Global

Redco Corporation

Rheem Manufacturing Company

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

Zurich American Insurance Company

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Philip C Hoffman

Dayal S. Reddy

Defendant Attorneys

Margaret M. Joffe

Kenan S. Rand, Jr

Shelley L. Thompson

Peter Andersen Moir

Cole Christian Trolinger

Mitchell F Tedesco

Shawn D. Golden

Stacey Leigh Strain

Rocky Wayne Eaton

John Joseph Hainkel, III

Angela M. Bowlin

Kelsey Eagan

Kelly L. Long

Charles B. Wilmore

Devin C. Reid

Alec Nelson Andrade

Brady McNeil Hadden

27 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Gulf Engineering Company, LLC.Attorney Louis Oliver Oubre added to party Gulf Engineering Company, LLC(pty:dft).(Oubre, Louis) Modified text/link on 11/6/2023 (rt). (Entered: 11/03/2023)

#24

(#24) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mosaic Company for Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc. (Reid, Devin) (Entered: 11/01/2023)

#23

(#23) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc..(Reid, Devin) (Entered: 11/01/2023)

#22

(#22) ORDER granting #21 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Freeport McMoran Inc dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/31/2023. (blg) (Entered: 11/01/2023)

21 #1

Proposed Order

#21

(#21) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Freeport-McMoran Inc. by Ellery Ragas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Philip) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

19 #2

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

19 #1

Memorandum in Support

#19

(#19) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ellery Ragas. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/29/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Hoffman, Philip) Modified on 10/18/2023 (lag). (Entered: 10/17/2023)

#4

(#5) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Notice (Other) ; Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Statement of Corporate Disclosure. Clerk took corrective action. (lag) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

#3

(#3) DIRECTIVE BY THE CLERK pursuant to 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Paramount Global, General Electric Company. (my) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#17) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, and Affirmative Defenses by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Roth, Katherine) (Entered: 10/09/2023)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#26) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #25 Answer to Complaint. Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' OR by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking 25 document to document 1. (rt) (Entered: 11/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Gulf Engineering Company, LLC.Attorney Louis Oliver Oubre added to party Gulf Engineering Company, LLC(pty:dft).(Oubre, Louis) Modified text/link on 11/6/2023 (rt). (Entered: 11/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mosaic Company for Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc. (Reid, Devin) (Entered: 11/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc..(Reid, Devin) (Entered: 11/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) ORDER granting #21 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Freeport McMoran Inc dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/31/2023. (blg) (Entered: 11/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Freeport-McMoran Inc. by Ellery Ragas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Philip) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #19 Motion to Remand to State Court ; Name of attorney who electronically filed this document does not match name of signatory attorney on pleading. The user log-in and password serve as the required signature for purposes of Rule 11 of the FRCP. No further action is necessary. (lag) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ellery Ragas. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/29/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Hoffman, Philip) Modified on 10/18/2023 (lag). (Entered: 10/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Roth, Katherine) (Entered: 10/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, and Affirmative Defenses by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Roth, Katherine) (Entered: 10/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Flowserve US Inc identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve US Inc (Strain, Stacey) (Entered: 09/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Rheem Manufacturing Company identifying Corporate Parent Paloma Rheem Global, Inc for Rheem Manufacturing Company (Williams, Robert) (Entered: 09/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Paramount Global identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for Paramount Global (Long, Kelly) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by General Electric Company (Long, Kelly) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Notice (Other) ; Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Statement of Corporate Disclosure. Clerk took corrective action. (lag) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Redco Corporation. (Romero, Jacqueline) Modified on 9/25/2023 (lag). (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) DIRECTIVE BY THE CLERK pursuant to 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Paramount Global, General Electric Company. (my) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2023-6347 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10158679) filed by General Electric Company, Paramount Global. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Kelly L. Long added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly L. Long added to party Paramount Global(pty:dft).(Long, Kelly) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less