This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/18/2023 at 13:38:22 (UTC).

Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. ACI Payments Inc et al

Case Summary

On 09/19/2023 Nationstar Mortgage LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ACI Payments Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ada Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-02089

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ada Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nationstar Mortgage LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper

Defendants

ACI Payments Inc

ACI Worldwide Corp

ACI Worldwide Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Justin R Opitz

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against ACI Payments, Inc., ACI Worldwide Corp., ACI Worldwide, Inc. filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-14044085) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Opitz, Justin) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

1 #1

Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Opitz, Justin) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#4

(#4) ***DISREGARD - PLEASE SEE #5 *** Summons Issued as to ACI Payments Inc, ACI Worldwide Corp, ACI Worldwide Inc. (oyh) Modified on 9/22/2023 (rekc). (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#5

(#5) Summons Reissued as to ACI Payments Inc, ACI Worldwide Corp, ACI Worldwide Inc. (rekc) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to ACI Payments Inc. Waiver sent on 9/25/2023. (Opitz, Justin) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to ACI Worldwide Corp. Waiver sent on 9/25/2023. (Opitz, Justin) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to ACI Worldwide Inc. Waiver sent on 9/25/2023. (Opitz, Justin) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

 

Docket Entries

09/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to ACI Worldwide Inc. Waiver sent on 9/25/2023. (Opitz, Justin) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to ACI Worldwide Corp. Waiver sent on 9/25/2023. (Opitz, Justin) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to ACI Payments Inc. Waiver sent on 9/25/2023. (Opitz, Justin) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Summons Reissued as to ACI Payments Inc, ACI Worldwide Corp, ACI Worldwide Inc. (rekc) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ***DISREGARD - PLEASE SEE #5 *** Summons Issued as to ACI Payments Inc, ACI Worldwide Corp, ACI Worldwide Inc. (oyh) Modified on 9/22/2023 (rekc). (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Opitz, Justin) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against ACI Payments, Inc., ACI Worldwide Corp., ACI Worldwide, Inc. filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-14044085) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Opitz, Justin) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less