This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2023 at 09:29:47 (UTC).

Ayinampudi et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2023 Ayinampudi filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against U S Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan M. Bazis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-03166

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan M. Bazis

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Srinath Ayinampudi

Hemalatha Pavuluri

Defendants

U.S. Department of Homeland Security

U.S. Department of State

Alejandro Mayorkas

Ur Jaddou

Shonnie R. Lyon

Christopher Wray

Merrick B. Garland

U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam J. Rosen

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

10/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Civil Process Clerk, US Attorney's Office for the District of Nebraska on 09/19/2023 defendant Merrick B. Garland on 9/18/2023; Ur Jaddou on 9/18/2023; Shonnie R. Lyon on 9/18/2023; Alejandro Mayorkas on 9/18/2023; U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services on 9/18/2023; U.S. Department of Homeland Security on 9/18/2023; U.S. Department of State on 9/18/2023; Christopher Wray on 9/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service on US Attorney General, #2 Proof of Service on DHS, #3 Proof of Service on USCIS, #4 Proof of Service on DOS, #5 Proof of Service on DHS Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas, #6 Proof of Service on USCIS Director Ur Jaddou, #7 Proof of Service on DHS/OBIM Director Shonnie Lyon, #8 Proof of Service on FBI Director Christopher Wray)(Rosen, Adam) (Entered: 10/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to defendants Merrick B. Garland, Ur Jaddou, Shonnie R. Lyon, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, Christopher Wray, and United States Attorney's Office. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JES) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

Docket(#4) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Summons Requested as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of State, DHS Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas, USCIS Director Ur Jaddou, OBIM/DHS Director Shonnie R. Lyon, FBI Director Christopher Wray, U.S. Attorney General Merrick Garland, FBI Director Christopher Wray, and Civil Process Clerk, US Attorney's Office regarding Complaint, #1 . (Rosen, Adam) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Adam J. Rosen on behalf of Plaintiffs Hemalatha Pavuluri, Srinath Ayinampudi.(Rosen, Adam) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Merrick B. Garland, Ur Jaddou, Shonnie R. Lyon, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, Christopher Wray ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4936014), by Attorney Adam J. Rosen on behalf of Hemalatha Pavuluri, Srinath Ayinampudi (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table and Exhibits A to H, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosen, Adam) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less