This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/12/2023 at 11:49:17 (UTC).

Mellenthin v. Mead Johnson & Company, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2023 Mellenthin filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Mead Johnson Company, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronnie L. White. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-01146

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronnie L. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tammy Mellenthin

Defendants

Mead Johnson & Company, LLC

Mead Johnson Nutrition Company

Susie Mondello

Abbott Laboratories, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric D. Holland

Erika Marie Stassi

Patrick R Dowd

Robert J. Evola

Amelia Igo Pelly Frenkel

Ashley Keller

Benjamin J. Whiting

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony Anscombe

Anthony J. Monaco

Donald M. Flack

Evan Glassman

Khristopher Johnson-DeLoatch

Maureen O. Bryan

Robert W. Stephens

T. Allon Renfro

Booker T. Shaw

Bryce A. Cooper

Emilee Bramstedt

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#73

(#73) ORDER OF REMAND: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to remand this case to the Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, Missouri, from which it was removed. Pursuant to Local Rule 13.05, Section B(2), if a party wishes for any documents previously filed under seal to remain sealed, a Motion to Continue Sealing must be filed in this case within 90 days following the final disposition of the litigation. (A certified copy of the Order and docket sheet were mailed to Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, Missouri, this date.) (60-Day Reminder for LR 13.05 Unsealing 12/26/2023, 90-day Reminder for LR 13.05 Unsealing 1/23/2024) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/25/2023. (TMT) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

#72

(#72) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Tammy Mellenthin's Motion to Remand is GRANTED. [ECF No. #26 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, Missouri. An appropriate Order of Remand will accompany this memorandum and order. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/25/2023. (TMT) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

#61

(#66) Docket Text ORDER Re: ECF No. #61 , MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Tammy Mellenthin, filed by attorney Sara Abston; ORDERED GRANTED. Attorney Sara Abston terminated. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on October 25, 2023. (LTR) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

#26

(#72) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Tammy Mellenthin's Motion to Remand is GRANTED. [ECF No. #26 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, Missouri. An appropriate Order of Remand will accompany this memorandum and order. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/25/2023. (TMT) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

#10

(#68) Docket Text ORDER Re: ECF No. #10 , MOTION for More Definite Statement and/or for Bill of Particulars, filed by Defendant Abbott Laboratories, Inc.; DENIED as moot, as Plaintiff Tammy Mellenthin filed a First Amended Petition on behalf of K.M., a minor child. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on October 25, 2023. (LTR) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

#8

(#67) Docket Text ORDER Re: ECF No. #8 , MOTION for More Definite Statement and/or for Bill of Particulars, filed by Defendants Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, and Mead Johnson Nutrition Company; DENIED as moot, as Plaintiff Tammy Mellenthin filed a First Amended Petition on behalf of K.M., a minor child. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on October 25, 2023. (LTR) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

#6

(#6) Mead Johnson Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's First Amended Petition by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company.(Bryan, Maureen) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Bryan, Maureen) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mead Johnson Nutrition Company, Reckitt Benckiser PLC.. (Bryan, Maureen) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company, Reckitt Benckiser PLC.. (Bryan, Maureen) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company, Reckitt Benckiser Group plc.. (Bryan, Maureen) Modified on 9/14/2023 (JWD). [Clerk's note: document sealed pursuant to Local Rule 2.17 because it contains the full name of a minor. The filer filed a redacted copy as docket entry #3] (Entered: 09/13/2023)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Original Filing Form

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Full State Court Docket

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City Circuit Court, case number 2222-CC00216, with receipt number CMOEDC-10160124, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Full State Court Docket, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bryan, Maureen) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#73) ORDER OF REMAND: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to remand this case to the Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, Missouri, from which it was removed. Pursuant to Local Rule 13.05, Section B(2), if a party wishes for any documents previously filed under seal to remain sealed, a Motion to Continue Sealing must be filed in this case within 90 days following the final disposition of the litigation. (A certified copy of the Order and docket sheet were mailed to Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, Missouri, this date.) (60-Day Reminder for LR 13.05 Unsealing 12/26/2023, 90-day Reminder for LR 13.05 Unsealing 1/23/2024) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/25/2023. (TMT) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#72) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Tammy Mellenthin's Motion to Remand is GRANTED. [ECF No. #26 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, Missouri. An appropriate Order of Remand will accompany this memorandum and order. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/25/2023. (TMT) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#71) SEALED Exhibit J by Plaintiff Tammy Mellenthin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K, #2 Exhibit T, #3 Exhibit U, #4 Proposed Order)(KCD) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#70) SEALED EXHIBIT 1 by Defendants Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 5)(KCD) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#69) SEALED EXHIBIT H by Plaintiff Tammy Mellenthin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Proposed Order)(KCD) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#68) Docket Text ORDER Re: ECF No. #10 , MOTION for More Definite Statement and/or for Bill of Particulars, filed by Defendant Abbott Laboratories, Inc.; DENIED as moot, as Plaintiff Tammy Mellenthin filed a First Amended Petition on behalf of K.M., a minor child. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on October 25, 2023. (LTR) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#67) Docket Text ORDER Re: ECF No. #8 , MOTION for More Definite Statement and/or for Bill of Particulars, filed by Defendants Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, and Mead Johnson Nutrition Company; DENIED as moot, as Plaintiff Tammy Mellenthin filed a First Amended Petition on behalf of K.M., a minor child. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on October 25, 2023. (LTR) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#66) Docket Text ORDER Re: ECF No. #61 , MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Tammy Mellenthin, filed by attorney Sara Abston; ORDERED GRANTED. Attorney Sara Abston terminated. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on October 25, 2023. (LTR) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#65) Docket Text ORDER Re: ECF No. #60 , MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Tammy Mellenthin, filed by attorney W. Mark Lanier; ORDERED GRANTED. Attorney W. Mark Lanier terminated. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on October 25, 2023. (LTR) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#64) Docket Text ORDER Re: ECF No. #49 , MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal, filed by Plaintiff Tammy Mellenthin; ORDERED GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall detach and file under seal the exhibits submitted as attachments to the Sealed Memorandum, ECF No. #50 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Tammy Mellenthin is excused from the redaction requirement of Local Rule 13.05(A)(c). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the K.M.s medical records, Exhibits J and K, shall remain under seal indefinitely. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on October 25, 2023. (LTR) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
54 More Docket Entries
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) MOTION for More Definite Statement and/or Bill of Particulars by Defendant Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (JWD) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) #7 Petition (Removal/Transfer) filed by Defendant Susie Mondello. (JWD) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) MOTION for More Definite Statement and/or for Bill of Particulars by Defendants Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (JWD) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, filed by Sarah Hampton.(JWD) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Mead Johnson Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's First Amended Petition by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company.(Bryan, Maureen) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Bryan, Maureen) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mead Johnson Nutrition Company, Reckitt Benckiser PLC.. (Bryan, Maureen) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company, Reckitt Benckiser PLC.. (Bryan, Maureen) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company, Reckitt Benckiser Group plc.. (Bryan, Maureen) Modified on 9/14/2023 (JWD). [Clerk's note: document sealed pursuant to Local Rule 2.17 because it contains the full name of a minor. The filer filed a redacted copy as docket entry #3] (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City Circuit Court, case number 2222-CC00216, with receipt number CMOEDC-10160124, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Full State Court Docket, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bryan, Maureen) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less