4:23-CV-01074
08/25/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Property - Real Property Product Liability
Rodney H. Holmes
Fred E. Joelner
DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
DePuy Synthes, Inc.
DePuy Synthes Product, Inc.
DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc. doing business as DePuy Synthes Joint Reconstruction
DePuy International, Ltd.
Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.
Johnson & Johnson International, Inc.
Johnson & Johnson
Medical Devices Business Services, Inc.
DePuy, Inc.
DePuy Ireland Unlimited Company
DePuy Synthes Johnson & Johnson Ireland Ltd.
Paul T. Slocomb
John F. Kuenstler
(#23) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by DePuy International, Ltd., DePuy Ireland Unlimited Company, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Synthes Johnson & Johnson Ireland Ltd., DePuy Synthes Product, Inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., DePuy Synthes, Inc., DePuy, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Devices Business Services, Inc..(Kuenstler, John) (Entered: 10/04/2023)
(#22) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fred E. Joelner. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Slocomb, Paul) (Entered: 09/25/2023)
(#19) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendants DePuy International, Ltd., DePuy Ireland Unlimited Company, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Synthes Johnson & Johnson Ireland Ltd., DePuy Synthes Product, Inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., DePuy Synthes, Inc., DePuy, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Devices Business Services, Inc.. (Kuenstler, John) (Entered: 09/20/2023)
(#18) WAIVER of Service issued defendantDePuy Ireland Unlimited Company. sent to DePuy Irelan Unlimited Company on 8/31/23 filed by Fred E. Joelner. Waiver of Service due by 10/31/2023. (Slocomb, Paul) (Entered: 08/31/2023)
(#16) SUPPLEMENTAL Original Filing Form by Plaintiff Fred E. Joelner. (Slocomb, Paul) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
No Description Available
No Description Available
No Description Available
No Description Available
No Description Available
(#10) WAIVER of Service issued defendantJohnson & Johnson International, Inc.. sent to Johnson & Johnson Int, Inc. on 08/25/23 filed by Fred E. Joelner. Waiver of Service due by 10/25/2023. (Slocomb, Paul) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
(#9) WAIVER of Service issued defendantDePuy Synthes Product, Inc.. sent to DePuy Synthes Product, Inc. on 08/25/23 filed by Fred E. Joelner. Waiver of Service due by 10/25/2023. (Slocomb, Paul) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
(#8) WAIVER of Service issued defendantDePuy Synthes, Inc.. sent to DePuy Synthes, Inc. on 08/25/23 filed by Fred E. Joelner. Waiver of Service due by 10/25/2023. (Slocomb, Paul) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
(#7) WAIVER of Service issued defendantDePuy Synthes Sales, Inc.. sent to DePuy Synthese Sales, Inc. on 08/25/23 filed by Fred E. Joelner. Waiver of Service due by 10/25/2023. (Slocomb, Paul) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
(#6) WAIVER of Service issued defendantDePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.. sent to DePuy Orthpaedics, Inc. on 08/25/23 filed by Fred E. Joelner. Waiver of Service due by 10/25/2023. (Slocomb, Paul) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
(#5) WAIVER of Service issued defendantDePuy International, Ltd.. sent to DePuy International, Ltd. on 08/25/23 filed by Fred E. Joelner. Waiver of Service due by 10/25/2023. (Slocomb, Paul) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
(#4) WAIVER of Service issued defendantDePuy, Inc.. sent to Depuy, Inc. on 08/25/23 filed by Fred E. Joelner. Waiver of Service due by 10/25/2023. (Slocomb, Paul) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Paul T. Slocomb for Plaintiff Fred E. Joelner. (Slocomb, Paul) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
Docket(#23) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by DePuy International, Ltd., DePuy Ireland Unlimited Company, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Synthes Johnson & Johnson Ireland Ltd., DePuy Synthes Product, Inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., DePuy Synthes, Inc., DePuy, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Devices Business Services, Inc..(Kuenstler, John) (Entered: 10/04/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#22) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fred E. Joelner. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Slocomb, Paul) (Entered: 09/25/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#21) Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required # (moed-0001.pdf). (EAB) (Entered: 09/22/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#20) Docket Text ORDER: Re #19 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendants DePuy International, Ltd., DePuy Ireland Unlimited Company, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc et al; ORDERED GRANTED. Answer due 10/4/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rodney H. Holmes on 9/21/2023. (HMA) (Entered: 09/21/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Fred E. Joelner to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 9/26/2023. (HMA) (Entered: 09/21/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#19) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendants DePuy International, Ltd., DePuy Ireland Unlimited Company, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Synthes Johnson & Johnson Ireland Ltd., DePuy Synthes Product, Inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., DePuy Synthes, Inc., DePuy, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Devices Business Services, Inc.. (Kuenstler, John) (Entered: 09/20/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#18) WAIVER of Service issued defendantDePuy Ireland Unlimited Company. sent to DePuy Irelan Unlimited Company on 8/31/23 filed by Fred E. Joelner. Waiver of Service due by 10/31/2023. (Slocomb, Paul) (Entered: 08/31/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#17) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketCase Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney H. Holmes. 11 Waiver(s) of Service issued. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#16) SUPPLEMENTAL Original Filing Form by Plaintiff Fred E. Joelner. (Slocomb, Paul) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) WAIVER of Service issued defendantJohnson & Johnson International, Inc.. sent to Johnson & Johnson Int, Inc. on 08/25/23 filed by Fred E. Joelner. Waiver of Service due by 10/25/2023. (Slocomb, Paul) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) WAIVER of Service issued defendantDePuy Synthes Product, Inc.. sent to DePuy Synthes Product, Inc. on 08/25/23 filed by Fred E. Joelner. Waiver of Service due by 10/25/2023. (Slocomb, Paul) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) WAIVER of Service issued defendantDePuy Synthes, Inc.. sent to DePuy Synthes, Inc. on 08/25/23 filed by Fred E. Joelner. Waiver of Service due by 10/25/2023. (Slocomb, Paul) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) WAIVER of Service issued defendantDePuy Synthes Sales, Inc.. sent to DePuy Synthese Sales, Inc. on 08/25/23 filed by Fred E. Joelner. Waiver of Service due by 10/25/2023. (Slocomb, Paul) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) WAIVER of Service issued defendantDePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.. sent to DePuy Orthpaedics, Inc. on 08/25/23 filed by Fred E. Joelner. Waiver of Service due by 10/25/2023. (Slocomb, Paul) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) WAIVER of Service issued defendantDePuy International, Ltd.. sent to DePuy International, Ltd. on 08/25/23 filed by Fred E. Joelner. Waiver of Service due by 10/25/2023. (Slocomb, Paul) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) WAIVER of Service issued defendantDePuy, Inc.. sent to Depuy, Inc. on 08/25/23 filed by Fred E. Joelner. Waiver of Service due by 10/25/2023. (Slocomb, Paul) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Original Filing Form not filed. Civil Cover Sheet not filed. Completed Summons or Request for Waiver of Service not filed. Notice of Process Server form not filed. This deficiency must be filed in the case record immediately. (JWD) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Paul T. Slocomb for Plaintiff Fred E. Joelner. (Slocomb, Paul) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-10125992, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Fred E. Joelner.(Slocomb, Paul) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
[-] Read Less