This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/27/2023 at 07:58:13 (UTC).

LARSEN v. STILLWATER PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/28/2023 LARSEN filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STILLWATER PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Julien Xavier Neals and James B. Clark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-12064

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Julien Xavier Neals

Referral Judge

James B. Clark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michelle Larsen

Defendant

STILLWATER PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT R. GALLANT

Defendant Attorney

GREGORY S. PENNINGTON

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STILLWATER PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY from Morris County Superior Court, case number MRS-L-1135-23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14600511), filed by STILLWATER PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Letter to Clerk)(PENNINGTON, GREGORY) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #3

Letter to Clerk

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant, STILLWATER PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (PENNINGTON, GREGORY) Modified on 8/30/2023 (jd, ). (Entered: 08/28/2023)

#3

(#3) LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/30/2023 at 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 8/31/2023. (seb) (Entered: 08/31/2023)

#4

(#4) Diversity Disclosure Statement by STILLWATER PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (PENNINGTON, GREGORY) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

#5

(#5) Joint Discovery Plan by STILLWATER PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(PENNINGTON, GREGORY) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

 

Docket Entries

09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Joint Discovery Plan by STILLWATER PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(PENNINGTON, GREGORY) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Diversity Disclosure Statement by STILLWATER PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (PENNINGTON, GREGORY) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketNotice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (kd) (Entered: 09/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/30/2023 at 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 8/31/2023. (seb) (Entered: 08/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (jd, ) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by GREGORY PENNINGTON, on 8/28/2023 was submitted incorrectly as a Diversity Disclosure Statement event. For future reference use the event Corporate disclosure statement found under "Civil, Other documents". The Clerk has made the necessary changes to the docket text in order to reflect the submission. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jd, ) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, ) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Julien Xavier Neals and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, ) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant, STILLWATER PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (PENNINGTON, GREGORY) Modified on 8/30/2023 (jd, ). (Entered: 08/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STILLWATER PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY from Morris County Superior Court, case number MRS-L-1135-23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14600511), filed by STILLWATER PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Letter to Clerk)(PENNINGTON, GREGORY) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less