This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/15/2023 at 07:04:54 (UTC).

Santos et al v. Jones, Jr. et al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2023 Santos filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Jones, Jr. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary Kay Vyskocil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-02257

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary Kay Vyskocil

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rosa Stephanie Santos

Juan Capellan Taverez

Edwin Fontanez

Defendants

Smith Transport, Inc.

Ronald Jones, Jr.

Lisandro Rubio De Los Santos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Boris Humberto Linares

Defendant Attorney

Matthew P. Levy

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Summons and Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit Emails

1 #3

Exhibit Bill of Particulars

1 #4

Exhibit Response to Defendants' Demand for Discovery and Inspection

1 #5

Exhibit Email

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ronald Jones, Jr., Smith Transport, Inc...(Levy, Matthew) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levy, Matthew) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Ronald Jones, Jr., Smith Transport, Inc..(Levy, Matthew) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Boris Humberto Linares on behalf of Edwin Fontanez..(Linares, Boris) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Boris Humberto Linares on behalf of Rosa Stephanie Santos..(Linares, Boris) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Boris Humberto Linares on behalf of Juan Capellan Taverez..(Linares, Boris) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/28/2023

DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023

DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Judge Kenneth M. Karas is no longer assigned to the case..(aea) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Boris Humberto Linares on behalf of Juan Capellan Taverez..(Linares, Boris) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Boris Humberto Linares on behalf of Rosa Stephanie Santos..(Linares, Boris) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Boris Humberto Linares on behalf of Edwin Fontanez..(Linares, Boris) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Ronald Jones, Jr., Smith Transport, Inc..(Levy, Matthew) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levy, Matthew) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023

DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023

DocketMagistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023

DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023

Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Matthew P. Levy. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023

Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Matthew P. Levy to RE-FILE Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the PDF was not properly signed by the attorney; the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; the PDF must be filed separately. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ronald Jones, Jr., Smith Transport, Inc...(Levy, Matthew) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 801531/2023E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27477360).Document filed by Smith Transport, Inc., Ronald Jones, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Emails, #3 Exhibit Bill of Particulars, #4 Exhibit Response to Defendants' Demand for Discovery and Inspection, #5 Exhibit Email, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Levy, Matthew) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less