This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/24/2023 at 08:37:23 (UTC).

J.D. v. Saint Bernard's Roman Catholic Church

Case Summary

On 06/25/2023 J D filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Saint Bernard's Roman Catholic Church. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Gary R. Brown and Lee G. Dunst. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-04725

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary R. Brown

Referral Judge

Lee G. Dunst

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J. D.

Defendant

Saint Bernard's Roman Catholic Church

Interested Party

The Roman Catholic Diocese of Rockville Centre, New York

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stuart S. Mermelstein

Jason Samuel Sandler

Jeff Herman

Defendant Attorney

Brian R. Davey

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Saint Bernard's Roman Catholic Church from Supreme Court Nassau County, case number 900081/2021. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-16828907) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Davey, Brian) (Entered: 06/25/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

#2

(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (AC) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (AC) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by J. D. re #1 Notice of Removal, Rule 9027(e)(3) Statement of Non-Consent (Mermelstein, Stuart) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of MOTION to Change Venue by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Rockville Centre, New York /NOTICE OF JOINT PETITION TO FIX VENUE FOR CLAIMS RELATED TO THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF ROCKVILLE CENTRES BANKRUPTCY UNDER 28 U.S.C. 157(b)(5) AND 1334(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DRVC Related Parties Petition, Memorandum of Law, and Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B The District Court Order) (Stephens, Eric) Modified on 7/18/2023 to edit to a motion(JC). (Entered: 07/17/2023)

5 #1

Exhibit A - DRVC Related Parties Petition, Memorandum of Law, and Proposed Order

5 #2

Exhibit B The District Court Order

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Saint Bernard's Roman Catholic Church. (Davey, Brian) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

#7

(#7) MOTION for pre motion conference by J. D.. (Mermelstein, Stuart) (Entered: 07/25/2023)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION by Saint Bernard's Roman Catholic Church (Davey, Brian) (Entered: 08/02/2023)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION AND ORDER re #8 Stipulation filed by Saint Bernard's Roman Catholic Church. SO Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 8/7/2023. (CT) (Entered: 08/07/2023)

#10

(#10) Letter with attached summons in response to pre-motion conference request letter by Saint Bernard's Roman Catholic Church (Davey, Brian) (Entered: 08/08/2023)

#11

(#11) MEMORANDUM OF DECISION & ORDER: Based on the foregoing (Please See Order For Further Details), the cases listed in the Appendix are hereby immediately REMANDED to state court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to transfer the appropriate records to the clerks of the relevant state courts forthwith, and close the cases. So Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 8/10/2023. (Civil Case Terminated.) (GO) (Entered: 08/11/2023)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) MEMORANDUM OF DECISION & ORDER: Based on the foregoing (Please See Order For Further Details), the cases listed in the Appendix are hereby immediately REMANDED to state court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to transfer the appropriate records to the clerks of the relevant state courts forthwith, and close the cases. So Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 8/10/2023. (Civil Case Terminated.) (GO) (Entered: 08/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Letter with attached summons in response to pre-motion conference request letter by Saint Bernard's Roman Catholic Church (Davey, Brian) (Entered: 08/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) STIPULATION AND ORDER re #8 Stipulation filed by Saint Bernard's Roman Catholic Church. SO Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 8/7/2023. (CT) (Entered: 08/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) STIPULATION by Saint Bernard's Roman Catholic Church (Davey, Brian) (Entered: 08/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) MOTION for pre motion conference by J. D.. (Mermelstein, Stuart) (Entered: 07/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Saint Bernard's Roman Catholic Church. (Davey, Brian) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketSCHEDULING ORDER: Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst will hold the initial conference on 11/3/2023 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 830 of the U.S. District Court E.D.N.Y. Long Island Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York. The parties are directed to follow Judge Dunst's Individual Practice Rules, which are available on the Court's website, including by filing a joint Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by 10/27/2023 pursuant to Judge Dunst's Individual Practice Rule IV.A.1. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 7/18/2023. (CT) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of MOTION to Change Venue by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Rockville Centre, New York /NOTICE OF JOINT PETITION TO FIX VENUE FOR CLAIMS RELATED TO THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF ROCKVILLE CENTRES BANKRUPTCY UNDER 28 U.S.C. 157(b)(5) AND 1334(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DRVC Related Parties Petition, Memorandum of Law, and Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B The District Court Order) (Stephens, Eric) Modified on 7/18/2023 to edit to a motion(JC). (Entered: 07/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE by J. D. re #1 Notice of Removal, Rule 9027(e)(3) Statement of Non-Consent (Mermelstein, Stuart) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (AC) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (AC) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (AC) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Saint Bernard's Roman Catholic Church from Supreme Court Nassau County, case number 900081/2021. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-16828907) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Davey, Brian) (Entered: 06/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less