This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/10/2023 at 08:34:10 (UTC).

Kiritsis v. Stewart Title Guaranty Co.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2023 Kiritsis filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Stewart Title Guaranty Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is George Levi Russell, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-01877

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George Levi Russell, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vasilios Kiritsis

Defendant

Stewart Title Guaranty Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin J Pascale

Meighan Griffin Burton

Defendant Attorney

John Robert Fischel

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Reply to Pl Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Stewart Title Guaranty Co..(Fischel, John) (Entered: 08/14/2023)

10 #1

Exhibit circuit court docket sheet

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 103.(5) by John Robert Fischel on behalf of Stewart Title Guaranty Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit circuit court docket sheet)(Fischel, John) (Entered: 08/11/2023)

#9

(#9) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Vasilios Kiritsis (Burton, Meighan) (Entered: 08/01/2023)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#8

(#8) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Vasilios Kiritsis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Burton, Meighan) (Entered: 08/01/2023)

7 #3

Text of Proposed Order

7 #2

Exhibit

7 #1

Memorandum in Support

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Stewart Title Guaranty Co. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischel, John) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

#6

(#6) Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

5 #1

Jury Demand

#5

(#5) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Stewart Title Guaranty Co., filed by Vasilios Kiritsis. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand)(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Stewart Title Guaranty Co. re #1 Notice of Removal, Defendant's Statement Concerning Removal (Fischel, John) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

1 #5

Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit State Court Jury Demand

1 #2

Exhibit State Court Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court For Worcester County, case number C-23-CV-23-000124. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10703750), filed by Stewart Title Guaranty Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Summons, #2 Exhibit State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit State Court Jury Demand, #5 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet)(Fischel, John) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Reply to Pl Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Stewart Title Guaranty Co..(Fischel, John) (Entered: 08/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 103.(5) by John Robert Fischel on behalf of Stewart Title Guaranty Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit circuit court docket sheet)(Fischel, John) (Entered: 08/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Vasilios Kiritsis (Burton, Meighan) (Entered: 08/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Vasilios Kiritsis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Burton, Meighan) (Entered: 08/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Stewart Title Guaranty Co. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischel, John) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketTHE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (5-5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT WORCESTER COUNTY. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Stewart Title Guaranty Co., filed by Vasilios Kiritsis. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand)(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketCase Reassigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. District Judge Ellen Lipton Hollander no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE by Stewart Title Guaranty Co. re #1 Notice of Removal, Defendant's Statement Concerning Removal (Fischel, John) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Stewart Title Guaranty Co. identifying Corporate Parent Stewart Information Services Corporation, Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock Fund Advisors for Stewart Title Guaranty Co..(Fischel, John) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE by Stewart Title Guaranty Co. re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet (Fischel, John) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court For Worcester County, case number C-23-CV-23-000124. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10703750), filed by Stewart Title Guaranty Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Summons, #2 Exhibit State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit State Court Jury Demand, #5 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet)(Fischel, John) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less