This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/21/2023 at 08:05:31 (UTC).

WALSH v. THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 05/22/2023 WALSH filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Julien Xavier Neals and Andre M. Espinosa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-02758

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Julien Xavier Neals

Referral Judge

Andre M. Espinosa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DONNA WALSH

Defendant

THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SARA ELIZABETH KAPLAN

Defendant Attorney

ALNISA S. BELL

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14333137) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DONNA WALSH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(KAPLAN, SARA). (Entered: 05/22/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, ) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by DONNA WALSH. THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA served on 6/13/2023, answer due 7/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(KAPLAN, SARA) (Entered: 06/19/2023)

3 #1

Affidavit

#4

(#4) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant's time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Attorney ALNISA S. BELL for THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA added. (BELL, ALNISA) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA identifying Prudential Financial, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (BELL, ALNISA) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA.(BELL, ALNISA) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

 

Docket Entries

07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA.(BELL, ALNISA) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA identifying Prudential Financial, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (BELL, ALNISA) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketClerk`s Text Order - The document #4 submitted by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/19/2023. (sm) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant's time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Attorney ALNISA S. BELL for THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA added. (BELL, ALNISA) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by DONNA WALSH. THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA served on 6/13/2023, answer due 7/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(KAPLAN, SARA) (Entered: 06/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023

DocketNotice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (kd) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, ) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketCase assigned to Judge Julien Xavier Neals and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (jr) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information - Parties are to be entered in all capital letters as you did in 2:23-cv-2757 (now deleted) . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jr) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14333137) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DONNA WALSH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(KAPLAN, SARA). (Entered: 05/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less