6:23-CV-00360
05/15/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Labor - Labor Standard
Alan D Albright
Derek T. Gilliland
Jessica Stinson
G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc.
William Clifton Alexander
Alan Clifton Gordon
Austin W. Anderson
Carter T. Hastings
Lauren E. Braddy
(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17441572), filed by Jessica Stinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, William) (Entered: 05/15/2023)
Civil Cover Sheet
(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jessica Stinson. (Alexander, William) (Entered: 05/15/2023)
(#3) Summons Issued as to G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. (zv) (Entered: 05/17/2023)
(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jessica Stinson as to G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc.. Waiver sent on 5/19/2023, answer due 7/18/2023. (Alexander, William) (Entered: 05/23/2023)
DocketParties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated Standing Orders: #Order Regarding Court Docket Management and #Amended Standing Order for Pretrial Procedure. Both orders are available by clicking the hyperlink. (bot2) (Entered: 05/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jessica Stinson as to G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc.. Waiver sent on 5/19/2023, answer due 7/18/2023. (Alexander, William) (Entered: 05/23/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Summons Issued as to G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. (zv) (Entered: 05/17/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (zv) (Entered: 05/16/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketPlease remember to comply with the standing orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (zv) (Entered: 05/16/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jessica Stinson. (Alexander, William) (Entered: 05/15/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17441572), filed by Jessica Stinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, William) (Entered: 05/15/2023)
[-] Read Less