This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/20/2023 at 14:31:57 (UTC).

Comerica Bank v. Federal Reserve Bank of Atlanta

Case Summary

On 09/21/2023 Comerica Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Federal Reserve Bank of Atlanta. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jonathan J.C. Grey and Elizabeth A. Stafford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-12407

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jonathan J.C. Grey

Referral Judge

Elizabeth A. Stafford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Comerica Bank

Defendant

Federal Reserve Bank of Atlanta

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David F. Wells

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9497507 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne County - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Wells, David) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

#2

(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs (Wells, David) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Federal Reserve Bank of Atlanta* (MCho) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. All Defendants.[Federal Reserve Bank of Atlanta waiver sent on 10/30/2023, answer due 12/29/2023] (Wells, David) Modified on 11/16/2023 (MCho). (Entered: 11/15/2023)

 

Docket Entries

11/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. All Defendants.[Federal Reserve Bank of Atlanta waiver sent on 10/30/2023, answer due 12/29/2023] (Wells, David) Modified on 11/16/2023 (MCho). (Entered: 11/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (MCho) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Federal Reserve Bank of Atlanta* (MCho) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs (Wells, David) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9497507 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne County - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Wells, David) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less