This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/11/2023 at 09:46:02 (UTC).

Jennifer Meeks v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/12/2023 Jennifer Meeks filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Maria A. Audero and Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-07559

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

Presiding Judge

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer Meeks

Defendant

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert F Keehn

Defendant Attorney

Robert E Hess

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36021975 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Jennifer Meeks. (Attorney Robert F Keehn added to party Jennifer Meeks(pty:pla))(Keehn, Robert) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Meeks. (Keehn, Robert) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Jennifer Meeks, (Keehn, Robert) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Jennifer Meeks. (Keehn, Robert) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (sh) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (sh) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#9

(#9) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges.by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case transferred from Judge John A. Kronstadt to the calendar of Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:23-cv-07559 SB(MAAx). (rn) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

#10

(#10) CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

#11

(#11) First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint, First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company answer now due 11/3/2023, filed by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Attorney Robert E Hess added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Hess, Robert) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Hess, Robert) (Entered: 11/03/2023)

#13

(#13) Notice filed by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Notice of Interested Parties (Hess, Robert) (Entered: 11/03/2023)

#14

(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying MetLife, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Hess, Robert) (Entered: 11/03/2023)

#15

(#15) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court sets an in-person Mandatory Scheduling Conference set for hearing on December 15, 2023 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by December 5, 2023. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (jgr) (Entered: 11/04/2023)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court sets an in-person Mandatory Scheduling Conference set for hearing on December 15, 2023 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by December 5, 2023. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (jgr) (Entered: 11/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying MetLife, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Hess, Robert) (Entered: 11/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Notice filed by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Notice of Interested Parties (Hess, Robert) (Entered: 11/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Hess, Robert) (Entered: 11/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint, First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company answer now due 11/3/2023, filed by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Attorney Robert E Hess added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Hess, Robert) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges.by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case transferred from Judge John A. Kronstadt to the calendar of Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:23-cv-07559 SB(MAAx). (rn) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (sh) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (sh) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Jennifer Meeks. (Keehn, Robert) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Jennifer Meeks, (Keehn, Robert) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Meeks. (Keehn, Robert) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36021975 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Jennifer Meeks. (Attorney Robert F Keehn added to party Jennifer Meeks(pty:pla))(Keehn, Robert) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less