This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/21/2023 at 09:30:27 (UTC).

Michael Milloy v. Marriott Hotel Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2023 Michael Milloy filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Marriott Hotel Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Percy Anderson and Rozella A. Oliver. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-03916

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Milloy

Defendants

Marriott International, Inc.

Marriott Hotel Services, LLC

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Heather K Cox

Gregory P Wong

Defendant Attorneys

Julie Ann Bachert

Allison V. Saunders

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 23STCV08849 Receipt No: ACACDC-35354274 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Marriot Hotel Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint, #2 Answer to Complaint, #3 Proof of Service of Summons on Marriott Hotel Services Inc, #4 Proof of Service on Summons to Marriott International Inc) (Attorney Julie Ann Bachert added to party Marriot Hotel Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Julie Ann Bachert added to party Marriott International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bachert, Julie) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

1 #1

Summons & Complaint

1 #2

Answer to Complaint

1 #3

Proof of Service of Summons on Marriott Hotel Services Inc

1 #4

Proof of Service on Summons to Marriott International Inc

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Marriot Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc.. (Bachert, Julie) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of of Julie A. Bachert re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants Marriot Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc.. (Bachert, Julie) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Marriot Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc. (Bachert, Julie) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] by Judge Percy Anderson. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for July 10, 2023, at 10:30 a.m. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#11

(#11) MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE via ZOOM held before Judge Percy Anderson. The Court waived Local Rule 6-1 and Plaintiff's counsel moved to remand the action to the Los Angeles Superior Court based on Defendants' failure to adequately allege a basis for the Court's subject matter jurisdiction in the Notice of Removal. The Court granted plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Accordingly, this action is hereby remanded to Los Angeles Superior Court, Case Number 23STCV08849, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (See document for further details). (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (aco) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

#12

(#12) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. (aco) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

#13

(#13) Receipt of LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL - REMAND TO SUPERIOR COURT. (aco) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Receipt of LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL - REMAND TO SUPERIOR COURT. (aco) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. (aco) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE via ZOOM held before Judge Percy Anderson. The Court waived Local Rule 6-1 and Plaintiff's counsel moved to remand the action to the Los Angeles Superior Court based on Defendants' failure to adequately allege a basis for the Court's subject matter jurisdiction in the Notice of Removal. The Court granted plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Accordingly, this action is hereby remanded to Los Angeles Superior Court, Case Number 23STCV08849, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (See document for further details). (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (aco) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Percy Anderson. Status Conference by ZOOM is set for 5/30/2023 at 03:00 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kss) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] by Judge Percy Anderson. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for July 10, 2023, at 10:30 a.m. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Michael Milloy, upon Defendant Marriott International, Inc. served on 4/21/2023, answer due 5/12/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, CT Corporation System, Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Filed in State Court on 4/24/2023 Submitted with Attachment 4 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Michael Milloy, upon Defendant Marriot Hotel Services, Inc. served on 4/21/2023, answer due 5/12/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, CT Corporation System, Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Filed in State Court on 4/24/2023 Submitted with Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF DEFENDANTS' JOINT ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Marriott Hotel Services, LLC, Marriott International, Inc. Filed in State Court on 5/17/2023 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 .(car) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Marriot International, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Michael Milloy. Filed in State Court on 4/20/2023 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Marriot Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc. (Bachert, Julie) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of of Julie A. Bachert re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants Marriot Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc.. (Bachert, Julie) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Marriot Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc.. (Bachert, Julie) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 23STCV08849 Receipt No: ACACDC-35354274 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Marriot Hotel Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint, #2 Answer to Complaint, #3 Proof of Service of Summons on Marriott Hotel Services Inc, #4 Proof of Service on Summons to Marriott International Inc) (Attorney Julie Ann Bachert added to party Marriot Hotel Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Julie Ann Bachert added to party Marriott International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bachert, Julie) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less