This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/07/2023 at 08:01:53 (UTC).

Washburn v. Brown et al

Case Summary

On 05/08/2023 Washburn filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Brown. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is R David Proctor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00591

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R David Proctor

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Joshua Washburn

Counter Claimants and Defendants

Christopher Maurice Brown

Pennymac Loan Services LLC

Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation

Federal National Mortgage Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Rhonda Steadman Hood

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Austin E James

Carl Joseph Emmons

Elizabeth Joy Campbell

Richard R Raleigh, Jr

Christopher Lea Lockwood

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER This matter is before the court on Plaintiff's Motion for Remand. (Doc. # 7). The motion is DENIED. Within fourteen (14) days of the date of entry of this order, the parties SHALL file a joint report that (1) addresses whether all Defendants have been properly served and (2) proposes a briefing schedule for Pennymac's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/26/2023. (KAM) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

17 #1

Exhibit A - June 13 demand

#17

(#17) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Joshua Washburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - June 13 demand)(Hood, Rhonda) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

#16

(#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pennymac Loan Services LLC. filed by Pennymac Loan Services LLC (Campbell, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

11 #1

Exhibit A

10 #4

Exhibit Special Warranty Deed

10 #3

Exhibit Foreclosure Deed

10 #2

Exhibit Assignment of Mortgage

10 #1

Exhibit Mortgage

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss & Supporting Memorandum of Law by Pennymac Loan Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mortgage, #2 Exhibit Assignment of Mortgage, #3 Exhibit Foreclosure Deed, #4 Exhibit Special Warranty Deed)(Campbell, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

#7

(#9) TEXT ORDER - Before the court is Defendants' Motion to Stay Pretrial and Discovery Deadlines #8 . The Motion #8 is GRANTED. Accordingly, the deadlines for conducting a Rule 26(f) planning conference, filing a joint Rule 26(f) planning report, and commencing discovery are CONTINUED GENERALLY pending resolution of Plaintiffs Motion to Remand #7 .. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/8/2023. (KAM) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

5 #2

Exhibit Consent to Serve as Local Counsel

5 #1

Exhibit Affidavit & Certificate of Good Standing

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Elizabeth J. Campbell by Pennymac Loan Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit & Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Consent to Serve as Local Counsel)(Lockwood, Christopher) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#3

(#4) TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the Unopposed/Consent Motion to Extend Time for Defendant PennyMac Loan Services, LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint #3 . The Motion #3 is GRANTED. Defendant PennyMac Loan Services, LLC SHALL answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs amended complaint on or before June 14, 2023. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/16/2023. (KAM) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

#2

(#2) INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/9/2023. (KAM) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pennymac Loan Services LLC from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 2023-79., filed by Pennymac Loan Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KAM) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) ORDER This matter is before the court on Plaintiff's Motion for Remand. (Doc. # 7). The motion is DENIED. Within fourteen (14) days of the date of entry of this order, the parties SHALL file a joint report that (1) addresses whether all Defendants have been properly served and (2) proposes a briefing schedule for Pennymac's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/26/2023. (KAM) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Joshua Washburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - June 13 demand)(Hood, Rhonda) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pennymac Loan Services LLC. filed by Pennymac Loan Services LLC (Campbell, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) TEXT ORDER - Before the court is Plaintiff's Motion to Stay #11 . The Motion #11 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The deadline for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant Pennymac's Motion to Dismiss #10 is CONTINUED GENERALLY pending resolution of Plaintiff's Motion for Remand #7 . However, Plaintiffs request that the court stay all proceedings is DENIED. The court has already continued the deadlines for conducting a Rule 26(f) planning conference, filing a joint Rule 26(f) planning report, and commencing discovery 9 . If Plaintiff believes any additional obligations or proceedings are due to be stayed, he must identify them specifically. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/21/2023. (KAM) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Pennymac Loan Services LLC. (Campbell, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) NOTICE by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation of Consent to Removal and Intent to Invoke Federal Jurisdiction under 28 USC 1452(f) (Campbell, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Joy Campbell on behalf of Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Campbell, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) MOTION to Stay re #7 MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court MOTION to Remand to State Court by Joshua Washburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hood, Rhonda) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss & Supporting Memorandum of Law by Pennymac Loan Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mortgage, #2 Exhibit Assignment of Mortgage, #3 Exhibit Foreclosure Deed, #4 Exhibit Special Warranty Deed)(Campbell, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) TEXT ORDER - Before the court is Defendants' Motion to Stay Pretrial and Discovery Deadlines #8 . The Motion #8 is GRANTED. Accordingly, the deadlines for conducting a Rule 26(f) planning conference, filing a joint Rule 26(f) planning report, and commencing discovery are CONTINUED GENERALLY pending resolution of Plaintiffs Motion to Remand #7 .. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/8/2023. (KAM) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
06/01/2023

DocketPHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4354890. (Lockwood, Christopher) Modified on 6/2/2023 NDAL rec# B5584 (KAM). (Entered: 06/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Elizabeth J. Campbell by Pennymac Loan Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit & Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Consent to Serve as Local Counsel)(Lockwood, Christopher) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the Unopposed/Consent Motion to Extend Time for Defendant PennyMac Loan Services, LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint #3 . The Motion #3 is GRANTED. Defendant PennyMac Loan Services, LLC SHALL answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs amended complaint on or before June 14, 2023. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/16/2023. (KAM) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Pennymac Loan Services LLC. (Lockwood, Christopher) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/9/2023. (KAM) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pennymac Loan Services LLC from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 2023-79., filed by Pennymac Loan Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KAM) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketANSWER to Amended Complaint by Christopher Maurice Brown. (deemed filed on 5/1/2023 in state court)(KAM) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketANSWER to Counterclaim by Joshua Washburn. (within amended complaint, deemed filed 3/31/2023 in state court)(KAM) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT against Christopher Maurice Brown, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Pennymac Loan Services LLC, filed by Joshua Washburn. (deemed filed 3/31/2023 in state court)(KAM) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketANSWER to Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIM against Joshua Washburn by Christopher Maurice Brown. (deemed filed on 2/13/2023 in state court)(KAM) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less