This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/18/2023 at 01:40:34 (UTC).

Adams v. Crown Equipment Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2023 Adams filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Crown Equipment Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David L. Bunning and Edward B. Atkins. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:23-CV-00047

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David L. Bunning

Referral Judge

Edward B. Atkins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lance Adams

Defendants

Crown Equipment Corporation

Crown Equipment Corporation doing business as Crown Lift Trucks

Crown Equipment Corporation doing business as Crown Lift Trucks Lexington

Jason Hartings

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert W. Miller

Defendant Attorney

Michael J. Farrell

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Carter County Circuit Court, case number 23-CI-00094. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number BKYEDC-5531138), filed by Jason Hartings, Crown Equipment Corporation. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record)(JLS) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

1 #1

State Court Record

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Jason Hartings on April 12-2023, filed by Jason Hartings. (JLS) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#4

(#4) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Crown Equipment Corporation. (JLS) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#5

(#5) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Ashland to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required.. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/15/22.(JLS)cc: COR (Entered: 04/17/2023)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Crown Equipment Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Farrell, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

6 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jason Hartings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Farrell, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

7 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Jason Harting

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF FILING by Jason Hartings re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jason Hartings Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss (Farrell, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

#9

(#9) Intradistrict Transfer to Lexington. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 4/24/23.(JLS)cc: COR (Entered: 04/24/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Intradistrict Transfer to Lexington. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 4/24/23.(JLS)cc: COR (Entered: 04/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Michael Farrell re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jason Hartings. Error: attachment was insufficiently described as Exhibit A.Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachment.Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect);Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required bycounsel. cc: COR (JLS) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF FILING by Jason Hartings re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jason Hartings Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss (Farrell, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jason Hartings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Farrell, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Crown Equipment Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Farrell, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Ashland to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required.. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/15/22.(JLS)cc: COR (Entered: 04/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Bunning for jurisdictional review: #1 Notice of Removal. (JLS) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Crown Equipment Corporation. (JLS) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Jason Hartings on April 12-2023, filed by Jason Hartings. (JLS) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketConflict Check run. (JLS) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Carter County Circuit Court, case number 23-CI-00094. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number BKYEDC-5531138), filed by Jason Hartings, Crown Equipment Corporation. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record)(JLS) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less