This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2023 at 14:32:10 (UTC).

Counts v. Efford et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2023 Counts filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Efford. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Nina R. Morrison and Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-06842

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nina R. Morrison

Referral Judge

Ramon E. Reyes, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lance Counts

Defendants

Henry Efford

United States Postal Service

Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Park

Defendant Attorneys

Breon Stacey Peace

Elizabeth Gates

Robert Joseph Pfuhler

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Henry Efford, United States Postal Service from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Queens, case number Index No. 709472/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (CV) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit C

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (CV) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

#3

(#3) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/26/2023 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 13D South before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See attached blank document) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 10/23/2023. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/15/2023. (MV) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

#4

(#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Henry Efford, United States Postal Service. (Gates, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION to transfer venue by Henry Efford, United States Postal Service (Gates, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/04/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Gates on behalf of Henry Efford, United States Postal Service (notification declined or already on case) (Gates, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Joseph Pfuhler on behalf of Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Pfuhler, Robert) (Entered: 10/09/2023)

 

Docket Entries

10/30/2023

DocketCase transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in District of New Jersey [LIVE] as case 2:23-cv-21640, filed 10/30/2023. (TLH) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER: The parties' #5 stipulation to transfer venue is So Ordered. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Ordered by Judge Nina R. Morrison on 10/11/2023. (AD) (Entered: 10/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Joseph Pfuhler on behalf of Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Pfuhler, Robert) (Entered: 10/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Gates on behalf of Henry Efford, United States Postal Service (notification declined or already on case) (Gates, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER: So that the Court may consider the parties' #5 stipulation to transfer venue, counsel for the defendants are directed to enter a notice of appearance by October 11, 2023. Ordered by Judge Nina R. Morrison on 10/5/2023. (AD) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) STIPULATION to transfer venue by Henry Efford, United States Postal Service (Gates, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSet/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference previously set for 10/26/2023 is adjourned to 12/6/2023 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 13D South before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Case Management Statement #3 must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 12/1/2023. (MV) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER granting #4 Consent MOTION for United States Postal Service and Henry Efford Extension of Time to File Answer move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint from September 21, 2023 to November 20, 2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/21/2023. (MV) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Henry Efford, United States Postal Service. (Gates, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/26/2023 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 13D South before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See attached blank document) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 10/23/2023. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/15/2023. (MV) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (CV) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketThis case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (CV) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Henry Efford, United States Postal Service from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Queens, case number Index No. 709472/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (CV) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less