This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/14/2023 at 13:44:08 (UTC).

STEWART v. TRANS UNION, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 STEWART filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against TRANS UNION, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah Evans Barker and Mark J. Dinsmore. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-01672

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah Evans Barker

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDWARD STEWART

Defendant

TRANS UNION, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Duran Keller

Defendant Attorney

Evan Rutter

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Vigo County, State of Indiana, case number 84D01-2302-CT-000734, filed by TRANS UNION, LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7815072) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, State Court Record and Docket Sheet, #2 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rutter, Evan) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit A, State Court Record and Docket Sheet

1 #2

Plaintiff's Amended Complaint

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Evan Rutter on behalf of Defendant TRANS UNION, LLC. (Rutter, Evan) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

#3

(#3) Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by TRANS UNION, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TRANSUNION INTERMEDIATE HOLDINGS, INC., Corporate Parent TRANSUNION, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., for TRANS UNION, LLC.. (Rutter, Evan) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LBT) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

#5

(#5) Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (LBT) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) (Amended Complaint) and Affirmative Defenses, filed by TRANS UNION, LLC.(Rutter, Evan) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

#7

(#7) CLOSED DISMISSED - case transferred to 2:23-cv-464-JPH-MJD. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 9/26/2023.(KAA) (Entered: 09/27/2023)

 

Docket Entries

09/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) CLOSED DISMISSED - case transferred to 2:23-cv-464-JPH-MJD. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 9/26/2023.(KAA) (Entered: 09/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) (Amended Complaint) and Affirmative Defenses, filed by TRANS UNION, LLC.(Rutter, Evan) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (LBT) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LBT) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by TRANS UNION, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TRANSUNION INTERMEDIATE HOLDINGS, INC., Corporate Parent TRANSUNION, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., for TRANS UNION, LLC.. (Rutter, Evan) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Evan Rutter on behalf of Defendant TRANS UNION, LLC. (Rutter, Evan) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Vigo County, State of Indiana, case number 84D01-2302-CT-000734, filed by TRANS UNION, LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7815072) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, State Court Record and Docket Sheet, #2 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rutter, Evan) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less