This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/25/2023 at 07:38:11 (UTC).

Leibel v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2023 Leibel filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric C. Tostrud and David T. Schultz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:23-CV-01572

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric C. Tostrud

Referral Judge

David T. Schultz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James A Leibel

Defendants

TransUnion LLC

Equifax Information Services LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Trans Union LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David J S Madgett

Defendant Attorneys

Amy M Sieben

Bradley D Fisher

William M Huse

Jeremy Thompson

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/5/2023. (TJB) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

#15

(#15) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Pro Hac Vice Admission) of Preston R. Grimes filed by TransUnion LLC.(Huse, William) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

#14

(#14) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Pro Hac Vice Admission) of Preston R. Grimes filed by TransUnion LLC. (Huse, William) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William M. Huse. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10373359 filed by TransUnion LLC. (Fisher, Bradley) (Entered: 06/27/2023)

#11

(#11) Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses filed by TransUnion LLC. (Grimes, Preston) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/1/2023. (TJB) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Preston R. Grimes. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10312292 filed by TransUnion LLC. (Fisher, Bradley) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

#7

(#7) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for TransUnion LLC. (Fisher, Bradley) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

#6

(#6) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

#4

(#4) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Equifax Information Services LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Thompson on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

1 #6

Certificate of Service

1 #5

Exhibit(s) E - Experian Consent to Removal

1 #4

Exhibit(s) D - Equifax Consent to Removal

1 #3

Exhibit(s) C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B - Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A - Summons

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/5/2023. (TJB) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Pro Hac Vice Admission) of Preston R. Grimes filed by TransUnion LLC.(Huse, William) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Pro Hac Vice Admission) of Preston R. Grimes filed by TransUnion LLC. (Huse, William) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) (Text-Only) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney William M Huse for TransUnion LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/28/2023. (jam) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William M. Huse. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10373359 filed by TransUnion LLC. (Fisher, Bradley) (Entered: 06/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses filed by TransUnion LLC. (Grimes, Preston) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/1/2023. (TJB) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) (Text-Only) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Preston Grimes for TransUnion LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/1/2023. (jam) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Preston R. Grimes. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10312292 filed by TransUnion LLC. (Fisher, Bradley) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for TransUnion LLC. (Fisher, Bradley) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Equifax Information Services LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Thompson on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • Docket(#2) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 23-cv-1572 ECT/DTS.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10304971) filed by Trans Union, LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Summons, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit(s) D - Equifax Consent to Removal, #5 Exhibit(s) E - Experian Consent to Removal, #6 Certificate of Service, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fisher, Bradley) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less